EP3044380 - DEVICE FOR SECURING TEETH TO TOOTH ADAPTERS OF AN EARTH-MOVING MACHINE THROUGH PINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rialca Due Di Chiolerio Paolo Giovanni Via Roma 31 10085 Pont Canavese (TO) / IT | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIOLERIO, Paolo Giovanni Via Roma 31 I-10085 Pont Canavese (TO) / IT | 02 /
CHIOLERIO, Carloalberto Via Roma 31 I-10085 Pont Canavese (TO) / IT | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Vitillo, Giuseppe Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 14786318.7 | 10.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014IB64394 | Priority number, date | IT2013TO00740 | 12.09.2013 Original published format: IT TO20130740 | [2016/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015036936 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044380 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
E02F9/2833 (EP,US);
E02F9/2825 (US);
F16B21/12 (EP,US);
F16B21/14 (EP,US);
F16B21/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN VON ZÄHNEN AN ZAHNADAPTERN EINER ERDBEWEGUNGSMASCHINE DURCH STIFTE | [2016/29] | English: | DEVICE FOR SECURING TEETH TO TOOTH ADAPTERS OF AN EARTH-MOVING MACHINE THROUGH PINS | [2016/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE DENTS À DES ADAPTATEURS DE DENTS D'UN ENGIN DE TERRASSEMENT PAR LE BIAIS DE TIGES | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2004007852 (TRINITY IND INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10-15,17,18,20 * the whole document * [I] 4; | [X]US4067657 (KAARLELA WILLARD O) [X] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [X]JP5242569B (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,18 * figure - *; | [X]EP0343191 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-3,18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002023375 (PIPPINS SHERLOCK [US]) [X] 1,16,18,19 * figures 2,8-12,14-17 *; | [X]US6092958 (GALE PRESTON L [US]) [X] 1,7-9,18 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]FR2979646 (AFE METAL [FR]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]US5172500 (RENSKI WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]JPH03122139U (.) [X] 1 * figure - * | Examination | US3888133 | by applicant | ES1068766U |