EP3030391 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HONEYCOMB INSULATING BUILDING BLOCK FROM NATURAL OR RECONSTITUTED STONE, BLOCK PRODUCED AND WALL PRODUCED WITH SUCH A BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Occitanie Pierres Lieu dit "Saint Henri" 46000 Cahors / FR | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTRAND, Jean-Luc Saute Crabe F-46150 Gigouzac / FR | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Ipside 6, Impasse Michel Labrousse 31100 Toulouse / FR | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 14786950.7 | 11.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014FR52075 | Priority number, date | FR20130001912 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: FR 1301912 | [2016/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015019033 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030391 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030391 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/28, E04B2/42, B28B11/12 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
B28B11/12 (EP);
E04B2/28 (EP);
E04B2/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | B28B11/12, E04B2/14, E04B2/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WABENFÖRMIGEN DÄMMBAUSTEINS AUS NATÜRLICHEM ODER WIEDERAUFBEREITETEM STEIN, HERGESTELLTER BAUSTEIN UND MIT SOLCH EINEM BAUSTEIN HERGESTELLTE WAND | [2016/24] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HONEYCOMB INSULATING BUILDING BLOCK FROM NATURAL OR RECONSTITUTED STONE, BLOCK PRODUCED AND WALL PRODUCED WITH SUCH A BLOCK | [2016/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN BLOC DE CONSTRUCTION ISOLANT ALVÉOLÉ EN PIERRE NATURELLE OU RECONSTITUÉE, BLOC REALISE ET MUR REALISE AVEC UN TEL BLOC | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 31.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.08.2014 | AL | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | IE | 11.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.08.2014 | |
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
IE | 11.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
IE | 11.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]LU30700 (PACIFIC TRADING CORPORATION) [X] 1,18 * page 2, paragraph 15 - page 4, paragraph 5; figures 1-14 * [Y] 9-11; | [XY]US2192723 (WHITACRE DONALD D) [X] 1,16,18,26 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 75; figures 1-5 * [Y] 25,27-30; | [Y]DE907453 (SVENSKA AKTIEBOLAGET TELL) [Y] 28-30* page 3, line 13 - line 38; figure 3 *; | [XY]GB2232696 (UNIV SALFORD [GB]) [X] 1,18,23,24 * page 1 * * page 6 - page 13; figures 1-11 * [Y] 25,27-31; | [XYI]EP0893546 (IND REGIONALE BATIMENT [FR]) [X] 1,3,5-8,18-22 * column 1, line 3 - line 14 * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 20; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9-14,17,25,27-31 [I] 2,4; | [XI]EP0984109 (ZIEGELEIEN FREIBURG & LAUSANNE [CH]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-4a * [I] 2,4; | [XYI]EP1120506 (EICHHORN EPL AG [CH]) [X] 1,3,5-8,15,18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 9-14,17,25,27-31 [I] 2,4 |