EP3055531 - METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE SPECIFIC CONSUMPTION OF A TWIN HELICOPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Helicopter Engines 64510 Bordes / FR | [2017/01] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Turbomeca 64510 Bordes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCONI, Patrick 1 Impasse Aliénor F-64110 Gelos / FR | 02 /
THIRIET, Romain 47 Rue Paul Verlaine F-64110 Jurancon / FR | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès 9 rue St Antoine du T 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2016/33] | Application number, filing date | 14787237.8 | 03.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014FR52508 | Priority number, date | FR20130059766 | 09.10.2013 Original published format: FR 1359766 | [2016/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015052413 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055531 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3055531 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/20, F02C9/44 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
F02C6/206 (EP,KR,RU,US);
F02C9/42 (KR,US);
B64C27/04 (US);
B64C27/12 (KR);
B64D27/10 (US);
F01D15/08 (KR,US);
F01D15/12 (KR,US);
F02C3/04 (KR,US);
F02C7/262 (KR,US);
F02C9/44 (EP,KR,RU,US);
F05D2220/329 (KR,US);
F05D2240/35 (KR,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES SPEZIFISCHEN VERBRAUCHS EINES TWIN-HELIKOPTERS | [2016/33] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE SPECIFIC CONSUMPTION OF A TWIN HELICOPTER | [2016/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION DE LA CONSOMMATION SPÉCIFIQUE D'UN HÉLICOPTÈRE BIMOTEUR | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2014 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | MT | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | IE | 03.10.2018 | LU | 03.10.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3367107 (RICHARDSON HARRY L, et al); | [A]EP1990519 (PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA [CA]); | [A]FR2933910 (EUROCOPTER FRANCE [FR]); | [AD]FR2967133 (TURBOMECA [FR]) | Examination | EP2602458 | by applicant | FR2967133 |