EP2990136 - POURING CONTROL METHOD AND MEMORY MEDIUM STORING PROGRAM TO HAVE COMPUTER FUNCTION AS POURING CONTROL MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation University of Yamanashi 4-37 Takeda 4-chome Kofu-shi Yamanashi 400-8510 / JP | For all designated states Sintokogio, Ltd. 11-11, Nishiki 1-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-0003 / JP | For all designated states National University Corporation Toyohashi University of Technology 1-1, Hibarigaoka Tenpaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Yoshiyuki c/o National University Corporation University of Yamanashi 4-4-37 Takeda Kofu-shi Yamanashi 400-8510 / JP | 02 /
TSUJI, Takaaki c/o National University Corporation University of Yamanashi 4-4-37 Takeda Kofu-shi Yamanashi 400-8510 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Makio c/o Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa-Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi Aichi 442-8505 / JP | 04 /
TERASHIMA, Kazuhiko c/o National University Corporation Toyohashi University of Technology 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tenpaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14787473.9 | 27.03.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014JP58802 | Priority number, date | JP20130094810 | 27.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013094810 | [2016/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014174977 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2990136 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22D37/00, B22D41/06, B22D46/00, B22D39/00, F27D3/14, F27D19/00 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
B22D37/00 (EP,US);
B22D39/00 (EP,US);
B22D41/06 (EP,US);
F27D19/00 (EP,US);
F27D3/14 (EP,US);
F27D2019/0028 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | B22D37/00, B22D41/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Title | German: | GIESSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM MIT PROGRAMM ZUR FUNKTION EINES COMPUTERS ALS GIESSSTEUERUNGSMITTEL | [2016/09] | English: | POURING CONTROL METHOD AND MEMORY MEDIUM STORING PROGRAM TO HAVE COMPUTER FUNCTION AS POURING CONTROL MEANS | [2016/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COULÉE ET PROGRAMME DE STOCKAGE SUR SUPPORT DE MÉMOIRE À FONCTION INFORMATIQUE EN TANT QUE MOYEN DE COMMANDE DE COULÉE | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2015 | Translation filed | 04.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2140955 (SINTOKOGIO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2008290148 (SINTOKOGIO LTD, et al) [A] 1 | International search | [A]JP2008290148 (SINTO KOGYO LTD.); | [A]JP2005088041 (SINTO KOGYO LTD.); | [A]JP2010253527 (SINTO KOGYO LTD.) | by applicant | JP4565240B | JP3537012B | JP4282066B | JP4328826B | JP4496280B |