EP2989820 - METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR TESTING INTER-CELL INTERFERENCE COORDINATION CAPABILITIES OF WIRELESS ACCESS NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keysight Technologies Singapore (Holdings) Pte. Ltd. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2018/08] |
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states Ixia 26601 W. Agoura Road Calabasas, California 91302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IYER, Rahul 106 Chandler Chase Court Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | 02 /
RANGAPPAGOWDA, Madhu, H. 1040 Kennicott Avenue Cary, NC 27513 / US | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/09] | Isarpatent Patentanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14787952.2 | 23.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014US35204 | Priority number, date | US201361816600P | 26.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361816600 P | US201414229789 | 28.03.2014 Original published format: US201414229789 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014176376 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2989820 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2989820 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2989820 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04W24/06, H04W92/20 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
H04L43/50 (EP,US);
H04L63/1466 (US);
H04W24/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | H04W24/06, H04W24/10, H04W92/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN ZUM TESTEN DER INTERZELLEN-INTERFERENZ-KOORDINATIONSKAPAZITÄTEN VON DRAHTLOSEN ZUGANGSKNOTEN | [2016/09] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR TESTING INTER-CELL INTERFERENCE COORDINATION CAPABILITIES OF WIRELESS ACCESS NODES | [2016/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET SUPPORTS LISIBLES PAR ORDINATEUR PERMETTANT D'ANALYSER DES CAPACITÉS DE COORDINATION D'INTERFÉRENCE INTERCELLULE DE N UDS D'ACCÈS SANS FIL | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 19.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2014 | AL | 10.01.2018 | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IE | 23.04.2018 | LU | 23.04.2018 | MT | 23.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
MT | 23.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
MT | 23.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
MT | 23.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
MT | 23.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2330843 (NOMOR RES GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 17 - page 7, paragraph 47 * * page 14, paragraph 96 - page 15, paragraph 105 * * figures 1A, 1B, 3, 4 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2012014333 (JI HYOUNG JU [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 29 - page 2, paragraph 35 * * page 6, paragraph 77 - page 6, paragraph 83 * * figures 1, 8, 9 *; | [Y]WO2012150894 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 9 - page 1, line 20 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 7 * * page 43, line 17 - page 44, line 2 * * figure 1A *; | [A]US2010075678 (AKMAN ARDA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 40 - page 5, paragraph 47 * * page 6, paragraph 61 - page 7, paragraph 67 * * figures 2, 3, 6, 7 *; | [A]EP2533572 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 20 - page 5, paragraph 41 * * figures 1, 2 * | International search | [A]US2006229018 (MLINARSKY FANNY [US], et al); | [A]US7889663 (WRIGHT CHARLES R [US], et al); | [A]US2006234636 (MILLER DOUGLAS M [US], et al); | [A]US7558565 (MILLER DOUGLAS M [US], et al); | [A]US2004214564 (ROSEN DEREK [US], et al) | by applicant | EP2330843 | US2012014333 | WO2012150894 |