EP3054852 - EXTREMITY IMAGING FOR ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carestream Health, Inc. 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YORKSTON, John c/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | 02 /
WENDLANDT, William, C. c/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | 03 /
NEWMAN, Peter, A. c/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | 04 /
WESOLOWSKI, Carl, R. c/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | 05 /
CSASZAR, Douglas, M. c/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | 06 /
HOFMANN, Craig, F. c/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | 07 /
RANKIN-PAROBEK, Donna, K. c/o Patent Legal Staff 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608 / US | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14789941.3 | 09.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014US59850 | Priority number, date | US201361889190P | 10.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361889190 P | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015054466 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054852 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
A61B6/508 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (US);
A61B6/04 (EP,US);
A61B6/107 (US);
A61B6/4007 (US);
A61B6/4085 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/33] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Title | German: | EXTREMITÄTENBILDGEBUNG FÜR TIERE | [2016/33] | English: | EXTREMITY IMAGING FOR ANIMALS | [2016/33] | French: | IMAGERIE D'EXTRÉMITÉ POUR ANIMAUX | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 17.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2011228901 (YORKSTON JOHN [US], et al) [X] 20 * fig. 12A, fig. 14B, paragraph [0084] * [A] 5 [I] 1-4,6-19; | [XA]WO2010044844 (PAPAIOANNOU GEORGE [US]) [X] 1 * fig. 6A; paragraph [0041] and [0043] * [A] 5; | [XAI]US2010278300 (YORKSTON JOHN [US], et al) [X] 20 * fig. 6, page 12, line 13-22 * [A] 5 [I] 1,2; | [A]JP2000210280 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 5 * fig. 2; paragraph [0022] *; | [A]GB2028053 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 5 * fig. 2; (8) * |