EP3062782 - COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND USES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABETES AND RELATED CONDITIONS BY CONTROLLING BLOOD GLUCOSE LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharnext 11-13 Rue René Jacques 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2019/20] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states Pharnext 11 Rue des Peupliers 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Daniel 132 Rue des Tennerolles F-92210 Saint Cloud / FR | 02 /
CHUMAKOV, Ilya 691 Rue de la Noue F-77000 Vaux le Penil / FR | 03 /
NABIROCHKIN, Serguei 49 Avenue de Sully Prud'homme F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | 04 /
HAJJ, Rodolphe 1 bis Rue Raymond Greban F-78100 Saint Germain En Laye / FR | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 14790106.0 | 29.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014EP73201 | Priority number, date | WO2013EP72728 | 30.10.2013 Original published format: PCT/EP2013/072728 | EP20140166734 | 30.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14166734 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015063140 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3062782 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/122, A61K31/137, A61K31/138, A61K31/16, A61K31/197, A61K31/216, A61K31/4164, A61K31/42, A61K31/437, A61K31/44, A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61K31/519, A61K31/53, A61K31/55 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (US);
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K31/216 (EP,US);
A61K31/24 (US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/50 (US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/155, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/16, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/197, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/216, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4164, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/422, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/42, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/53, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES UND ZUGEHÖRIGEN ERKRANKUNGEN DURCH REGELUNG DES BLUTZUCKERWERTS | [2016/36] | English: | COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND USES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABETES AND RELATED CONDITIONS BY CONTROLLING BLOOD GLUCOSE LEVEL | [2016/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS, PROCÉDÉS ET UTILISATIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENTS DE DIABÈTE ET D'ÉTATS ASSOCIÉS EN RÉGULANT LE NIVEAU DE GLYCÉMIE | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5019591 (GARDNER THOMAS W [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2003162754 (LIGON BROOKE [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0 34] * * claims 3,5,7,9,10-13 *; | [Y]WO2004011003 (PHARMACIA ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-12 * Summary * * Claims *; | [Y]US2005025714 (DUGGER HARRY A [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 40] , [0 43] * * claims 40, 41, 44, 96, 97, 100 *; | [Y]US2006004050 (SPEICHER BRIAN T [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * Detailed Description of the Invention * * example 2 ** claims 1-4, 10 *; | [Y]EP1884513 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * p. 42, items 23 and 26 * * paragraphs [0197] , [ 198] * * claims 23, 26 *; | [Y]US2008213362 (SOLOMON LAWRENCE [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [00 8] , [0 22] , [0 24] - [0026] * * claims 9-12, 23-28 *; | [Y]US2011046046 (HARA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 19] , [0 53] , [0067] , [0 73] * * claims 1, 2, 4 * * figures *; | [IY] - ABEDULLA KHAN K; SATYANARAYANA S; ESWAR KUMAR K; ANUPAMA K, "Pharmacodynamic drug interaction of mexiletine with metformin in rats", RESEARCH JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL, BIOLOGICAL AND CHEMICAL SCIENCES, (20120701), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 0975-8585, pages 905 - 911, XP055161335 [I] 1,3-12 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * 'Study in normal rats' * * 'Results and Discussion' * [Y] 1-12 | [Y] - DUNN C J ET AL, "A REVIEW OF ITS PHARMACOLOGICAL PROPERTIES AND THERAPEUTIC USE IN NON-INSULIN-DEPENDENT DIABETES MELLITUS", DRUGS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, NZ, (19950501), vol. 49, no. 5, doi:10.2165/00003495-199549050-00007, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 721 - 749, XP000921043 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * * in particular p. 738 et seqq. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199549050-00007 | [Y] - "Metformin/Repaglinide (PrandiMet) for type 2 diabetes", THE MEDICAL LETTER ON DRUGS AND THERAPEUTICS, USA, (20090601), vol. 51, no. 1313, ISSN 1523-2859, pages 41 - 43, XP009177448 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 41, column 2 * * 'Fixed-Dose Combinations' * * page 42 * * table 1 * | [Y] - FREYRIA J, "Clinical trial with an antiischemic drug in atherosclerotic and diabetic arteriopathies = Essai de la thérapeutique anti-ischémique dans le traitement des artériopathies de surchage", GAZETTE MEDICALE DE FRANCE, PARIS, FR, (19750101), vol. 82, no. 16, ISSN 0016-5557, page 1989, XP009175880 [Y] 1-12 * page 1989 * * page 1990, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1993, column 2, paragraph 1 * | [A] - SALEM H ET AL, "FENSPIRIDE A NONSYMPATHOMIMETIC BRONCHO DILATOR WITH ANTI ALLERGIC ACTIVITY", ARCHIVES INTERNATIONALES DE PHARMACODYNAMIE ET DE THERAPIE, HEYMANS INSTITUTE OF PHARMACOLOGY, GHENT, BE, (19710101), vol. 193, no. 1, ISSN 0003-9780, pages 111 - 123, XP009177441 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * | [Y] - WALKER B R ET AL, "HYPERKALEMIA AFTER TRIAMTERENE IN DIABETIC PATIENTS", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, (19720101), vol. 13, no. 5, part 1, ISSN 0009-9236, pages 643 - 651, XP009168825 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * page 644, column 1, paragraph 2 * * Results. Triamterene Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cpt1972135part1643 | [A] - YAMASHITA S ET AL, "GENERAL PHARMACOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES OF N-2 METHYL-3-CHLOROPHENYL ANTHRANILIC-ACID GEA-6414", IGAKKAI ZASSHI -JOURNAL OF MEDICAL SOCIETY OF TOHO UNIVERSITY, TOHO DAIGAKU IGAKUBU IGAKKAI, TOKYO, JP, (19810101), vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 0040-8670, pages 685 - 697, XP009177377 [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - FRANCO F ET AL, "P2165 Levosimendan is beneficial in diabetics with acute heart failure", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (20030301), vol. 24, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0195-668X(03)95159-1, ISSN 0195-668X, page 407, XP004531081 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0195-668X(03)95159-1 | Examination | US2008188457 | WO2008112167 | - RAGUCCI KELLY R ET AL, "Olanzapine-induced diabetic ketoacidosis", ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHE, HARVEY WHITNEY BOOKS COMPANY, US, (20011201), vol. 35, no. 12, doi:10.1345/APH.1A157, ISSN 1060-0280, pages 1556 - 1558, XP009092538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1345/aph.1A157 | - J. Shang ET AL, "Metformin-stimulated Mannose Transport in Dermal Fibroblasts", Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20031217), vol. 279, no. 11, doi:10.1074/jbc.M310837200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 9703 - 9712, XP055160708 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M310837200 | by applicant | - VAN BELLE, T.L.; K.T. COPPIETERS; M.G. VON HERRATH, "Type 1 diabetes: etiology, immunology, and therapeutic strategies", PHYSIOL REV, (2011), vol. 91, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1152/physrev.00003.2010, pages 79 - 118, XP002717471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/physrev.00003.2010 | - MAGGIO, C.A.; F.X. PI-SUNYER, "The prevention and treatment of obesity. Application to type 2 diabetes", DIABETES CARE, (1997), vol. 20, no. 11, pages 1744 - 66 | - STUMVOLL, M.; B.J. GOLDSTEIN; T.W. VAN HAEFTEN, "Type 2 diabetes: principles of pathogenesis and therapy", LANCET, (2005), vol. 365, no. 9467, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(05)61032-X, pages 1333 - 46, XP025276573 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(05)61032-X | - BODEN, G., "Role of fatty acids in the pathogenesis of insulin resistance and NIDDM", DIABETES, (1997), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 3 - 10 | - GOLDSTEIN, B.J., "Insulin resistance as the core defect in type 2 diabetes mellitus", AM J CARDIOL, (2002), vol. 90, no. 5A, pages 3G - 10G | - BESSAC, L., "Unmet medical needs and therapeutic goals in the treatment of type 2 diabetes", CURR OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2003), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 1173 - 8 | - ROLLA, A.R., "Starting insulin strategies for patients with an inadequate response to oral therapy", DIABETES OBES METAB, (2009), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 6 - 9 | - YANG, Y.X.; S. HENNESSY; J.D. LEWIS, "Insulin therapy and colorectal cancer risk among type 2 diabetes mellitus patients", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2004), vol. 127, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2004.07.011, pages 1044 - 50, XP005313020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2004.07.011 | - NATHAN, D.M. ET AL., "Medical management of hyperglycemia in type 2 diabetes: a consensus algorithm for the initiation and adjustment of therapy: a consensus statement of the American Diabetes Association and the European Association for the Study of Diabetes", DIABETES CARE, (2009), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 193 - 203 | - ETTMAYER, P.; AMIDON, G. L.; CLEMENT, B.; TESTA, B, "Lessons learned from marketed and investigational prodrugs", J. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1021/jm0303812, pages 2393 - 2404, XP001537347 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0303812 | - BEAUMONT, K.; WEBSTER, R.; GARDNER, I.; DACK, K, "Design of ester prodrugs to enhance oral absorption of poorly permeable compounds: challenges to the discovery scientist", CURR. DRUG METAB, (2003), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.2174/1389200033489253, pages 461 - 485, XP008058352 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1389200033489253 | - HEIMBACH, T. ET AL., "Enzyme-mediated precipitation of parent drugs from their phosphate prodrugs", INT. J. PHARM., (2003), vol. 261, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-5173(03)00287-4, pages 81 - 92, XP002349277 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(03)00287-4 | - YANG, C. Y.; DANTZIG, A. H.; PIDGEON, C., "Intestinal peptide transport systems and oral drug availability", PHARM. RES., (1999), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1018982505021, pages 1331 - 1343, XP000910009 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018982505021 | - STEFFANSEN, B. ET AL., "Intestinal solute carriers: an overview of trends and strategies for improving oral drug absorption", EUR. J. PHARM. SCI., (2004), vol. 21, pages 3 - 16, XP002329331 | - PEZRON, I. ET AL., "Prodrug strategies in nasal drug delivery", EXPERT OPIN. THER. PAT., (2002), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 331 - 340 | - STELLA, V., "J. Prodrugs as therapeutics", EXPERT OPIN. THER. PAT., (2004), vol. 14, pages 277 - 280 | - STELLA, V. J.; NTI-ADDAE, K. W, "Prodrug strategies to overcome poor water solubility", ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (2007), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2007.05.013, pages 677 - 694, XP022211987 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2007.05.013 | - "Prodrugs As Novel Drug Delivery Systems", ACS Symposium Series, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1975), page 31 | - ASFARI M.; JANJIC D.; MEDA P.; LI G.; HALBAN P.A.; WOLLHEIM C.B, "Establishment of 2-mercaptoethanol-dependent differentiated insulin-secreting cell lines", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1992), vol. 130, pages 167 - 78 | - FRANKFURT O.S.; KRISHAN A, "Enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay (ELISA) for the specific detection of apoptotic cells and its application to rapid drug screening", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2001), vol. 253, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(01)00387-8, pages 133 - 144, XP004241366 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(01)00387-8 | - FRYER L.G.; HAJDUCH E.; RENCUREL F.; SALT I.P.; HUNDAL H.S.; HARDIE D.G.; CARLING D, "Activation of glucose transport by AMP-activated protein kinase via stimulation of nitric oxide synthase", DIABETES, (200012), vol. 49, no. 12, doi:doi:10.2337/diabetes.49.12.1978, pages 1978 - 85, XP009008297 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.49.12.1978 |