EP2992439 - SELECTIVE BACKUP OF PROGRAM DATA TO NON-VOLATILE MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazon Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 8102 Reno, NV 89507 / US | [2022/23] |
Former [2016/10] | For all designated states Amazon Technologies Inc. Post Office Box 8102 Reno, NV 89507 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKELVIE, Samuel James 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 02 /
LESHINSKY, Yan Valerie 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 03 /
NOWLAND, Ian P. 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 04 /
FRINK, Darin Lee 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 05 /
GUPTA, Anurag Windlass 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 06 /
MORLEY, Adam Douglas 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 07 /
WATSON, Christopher Nathan 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 08 /
MARR, Michael David 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14791127.5 | 29.04.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014US35904 | Priority number, date | US201313872530 | 29.04.2013 Original published format: US201313872530 | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014179333 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2992439 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2992439 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/14, G06F11/14, G06F3/06, G06F12/02 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
G06F11/1441 (EP,US);
G06F11/1469 (US);
G06F11/14 (US);
G06F11/1402 (US);
G06F11/1451 (US);
G06F12/0246 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/065 (US);
G06F3/0688 (US);
G06F2201/84 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | G06F13/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE SICHERUNG VON PROGRAMMDATEN AUF EINEM NICHTFLÜCHTIGEN SPEICHER | [2016/10] | English: | SELECTIVE BACKUP OF PROGRAM DATA TO NON-VOLATILE MEMORY | [2016/10] | French: | SAUVEGARDE SÉLECTIVE DE DONNÉES DE PROGRAMME DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES NON VOLATIL | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 10.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2021 | 17.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2021 | 28.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2021 | 07.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | IT | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | NL | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6675295 (MARCELAIS MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 6 - column 10; figure 3 *; | [I]US2009249008 (HOSAKA FUMIAKI [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0085] *; | [I]US2012072771 (DOUCEUR JOHN R [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0030] * | International search | [Y]US2007078940 (FINEBERG SAMUEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US2007143299 (HURAS MATTHEW A [CA], et al); | [Y]US2011113208 (JOUPPI NORMAN PAUL [US], et al); | [X]US2012159106 (PICCIRILLO GARY J [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012083308 (FUSION IO INC [US], et al) |