EP3063334 - PROTECTIVE MESH, IN PARTICULAR FOR SECURING SLOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/36] | PROTECTIVE MESH, IN PARTICULAR FOR SECURING SLOPES, AND ASSOCIATED SPIKE PLATE | ||
[2017/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geobrugg AG Aachstrasse 11 8590 Romanshorn / CH | [2018/05] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states Geobrugg AG Aachstrasse 11 8590 Romanshorn / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTH, Andrea Wilenstrasse 19B CH-9322 Egnach / CH | 02 /
RODUNER, Armin Geretsfeld 22 CH-9466 Sennwald / CH | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2018/05] |
Former [2016/36] | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 14793036.6 | 21.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014EP72492 | Priority number, date | CH20130001851 | 01.11.2013 Original published format: CH 18512013 | [2016/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015062905 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063334 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3063334 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E01F7/04 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
E01F7/045 (EP,CH);
E02D17/202 (CH)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZNETZ, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE BÖSCHUNGSSICHERUNG | [2017/35] | English: | PROTECTIVE MESH, IN PARTICULAR FOR SECURING SLOPES | [2017/35] | French: | FILET DE PROTECTION, EN PARTICULIER POUR STABILISATION DE PENTE | [2017/35] |
Former [2016/36] | SCHUTZNETZ, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE BÖSCHUNGSSICHERUNG, SOWIE EINE DAZUGEHÖRIGE KRALLPLATTE | ||
Former [2016/36] | PROTECTIVE MESH, IN PARTICULAR FOR SECURING SLOPES, AND ASSOCIATED SPIKE PLATE | ||
Former [2016/36] | FILET DE PROTECTION, EN PARTICULIER POUR STABILISATION DE TALUS, ET PLAQUE À GRIFFES ASSOCIÉE | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 19.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2014 | AL | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | MT | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | IE | 21.10.2018 | LU | 21.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]CH696851 (EBERLE LANDSCHAFTSBAU AG [CH]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]AT7312U (TRUMER SCHUTZBAUTEN GESMBH [AT]) [A] 1,9 * page 2, lines 9-39 * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3415064 (ANTOINE TALOBRE JOSEPH) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3464308 (DOHMEIER HANS O) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * |