EP3071603 - CONTINUOUS OR SEMI-CONTINUOUS FREEZE COAGULATION METHOD FOR AQUEOUS POLYMER DISPERSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/39] | CONTINUOUS OR SEMI-CONTINUOUS FREEZING COAGULATION METHOD FOR AQUEOUS POLYMER DISPERSIONS | ||
[2018/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Dolivostrasse 17 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2019/42] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÖRKLE, Dominic Shanghai Racquet Club Room 14G-302 Lane 555 Jin Feng Road Minhang District 201107 Shanghai / CN | 02 /
WEBER, Andreas Nell-Breuning-Strasse 18 60596 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
VORHOLZ, Johannes Am Pavillon 5 63755 Alzenau / DE | 04 /
JUNGKAMP, Melanie 4304 Cathedral Court West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | 05 /
DENGER, Marcus Ringstrasse 7 64395 Brensbach / DE | 06 /
HOFFMANN, Norbert Bessunger Strasse 130 64347 Griesheim / DE | 07 /
RÜPPEL, Mona Mümlingstrasse 8 64739 Hoechst / DE | 08 /
MÜLLER, Reiner Schillerstrasse 12 64584 Biebesheim / DE | 09 /
ALBRECHT, Klaus Vogelsbergstrasse 20 55129 Mainz / DE | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Röhm Patent Association IP Management Dolivostraße 17 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14793579.5 | 06.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014EP73889 | Priority number, date | EP20130193654 | 20.11.2013 Original published format: EP 13193654 | [2016/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015074883 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3071603 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3071603 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08C1/14, C08F6/22, C08J5/12 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
C08F6/22 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C08C1/14 (KR);
C08F20/18 (KR);
C08J3/12 (KR);
C08J3/124 (KR);
C08J5/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F6/22, C08L33/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHES ODER SEMI-KONTINUIERLICHES GEFRIERKOAGULATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR WÄSSRIGE POLYMERDISPERSIONEN | [2016/39] | English: | CONTINUOUS OR SEMI-CONTINUOUS FREEZE COAGULATION METHOD FOR AQUEOUS POLYMER DISPERSIONS | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COAGULATION PAR GEL SEMI-CONTINU POUR DES DISPERSIONS POLYMÈRES AQUEUSES | [2018/42] |
Former [2016/39] | CONTINUOUS OR SEMI-CONTINUOUS FREEZING COAGULATION METHOD FOR AQUEOUS POLYMER DISPERSIONS | ||
Former [2016/39] | PROCÉDÉ CONTINU OU SEMI-CONTINU DE CRYOCOAGULATION DE DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE POLYMÈRES | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 28.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2014 | AL | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | IE | 06.11.2019 | LU | 06.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2187146 (STANSFIELD CALCOTT WILLIAM, et al); | [XDI]US4591632 (MOORE EUGENE R [US]); | [XI]US4857631 (MOORE EUGENE R [US]); | [XA]US2006281946 (MORITA SHIGERU [JP], et al); |