EP3049296 - BRAKE BOOSTER FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKE SYSTEM, COMPRISING A RETAINING MECHANISM FOR A RESTORING SPRING, AND BRAKE BOOSTER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucas Automotive GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 8 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARKENTIN, Paul Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 24 56564 Neuwied / DE | 02 /
CALVO MARTINEZ, Jose-Manuel Roemerstrasse 3 56642 Kruft / DE | 03 /
WINGENDER, Kurt Bergstrasse 7 56244 Hartenfels / DE | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/31] | 01 /
WARKENTIN, Paul Konrad Adenauerstrasse 24 56564 Neuwied / DE | ||
02 /
CALVO MARTINEZ, Jose-Manuel Roemerstrasse 3 56642 Kruft / DE | |||
03 /
WINGENDER, Kurt Bergstrasse 7 56244 Hartenfels / DE | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14793590.2 | 06.11.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014EP73944 | Priority number, date | DE20131021122 | 13.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013021122 | [2016/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015086231 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3049296 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3049296 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/565 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
B60T13/567 (EP,US);
B60T13/565 (US);
B60T13/57 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSKRAFTVERSTÄRKER FÜR EINE KRAFTFAHRZEUGBREMSANLAGE MIT RÜCKHALTEEINRICHTUNG FÜR RÜCKSTELLFEDER UND BREMSKRAFTVERSTÄRKUNGSANORDNUNG | [2016/31] | English: | BRAKE BOOSTER FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKE SYSTEM, COMPRISING A RETAINING MECHANISM FOR A RESTORING SPRING, AND BRAKE BOOSTER ASSEMBLY | [2016/31] | French: | SERVOFREIN POUR SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE COMPRENANT UN MOYEN DE RAPPEL D'UN RESSORT DE RAPPEL ET ENSEMBLE DE SERVOFREINAGE | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 09.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2014 | AL | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | IT | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | MT | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | IE | 06.11.2017 | LU | 06.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102008035179 (LUCAS AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6213569 (TSUBOUCHI KAORU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * | by applicant | DE102008035179 |