EP2994975 - DIFFERENTIAL LOAD DETECTING METHOD FOR DETECTING A WIRELESS POWER RECEIVER IN WIRELESS POWER NETWORK AND WIRELESS POWER TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kyung-Woo 251-503 Olympic Seonsuchon APT. 1218 Yangjae-daero, Songpa-gu Seoul 138-787 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Soo-Yeon 103-703 Samsung APT. 127 Pungseong-ro, Gangdong-gu Seoul 134-758 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Hee-Won 246-1601 Hwanggol Ssangyong APT. 16 Bongyeong-ro 1744beon-gil, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-744 / KR | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14794057.1 | 08.05.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014KR04069 | Priority number, date | KR20130053453 | 10.05.2013 Original published format: KR 20130053453 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014182076 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994975 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/00, H02J7/00 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
H02J7/0029 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/90 (KR);
H02J50/12 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/40 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/60 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/80 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Title | German: | DIFFERENTIELLES LASTENERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES DRAHTLOSEN STROMEMPFÄNGERS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN STROMNETZWERK UND DRAHTLOSER STROMSENDER | [2016/11] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL LOAD DETECTING METHOD FOR DETECTING A WIRELESS POWER RECEIVER IN WIRELESS POWER NETWORK AND WIRELESS POWER TRANSMITTER | [2016/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CHARGE DIFFÉRENTIELLE POUR DÉTECTER UN RÉCEPTEUR DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL DANS UN RÉSEAU DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL ET ÉMETTEUR DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 17.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012235509 (UENO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] *; | [I]WO2012157969 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * page 4, lines 25-28 * * page 2, lines 2-9 * * paragraph [0009] *; | [I]WO2013059300 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] - [0061]; figure 8 *; | [E]US2014361738 (LEE KYUNG-WOO [KR], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2008038203 (ACCESS BUSINESS GROUP INT LLC [US], et al); | [A]WO2011063054 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [A]JP2012044752 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]US2012223587 (NISHIYAMA TETSUYA [JP], et al); | [A]WO2013038808 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) |