EP2994898 - AUTOMATED ITEM RETURN MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazon Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 8102 Reno, NV 89507 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states Amazon Technologies Inc. Post Office Box 8102 Reno, NV 89507 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTER, Richard, F. 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14794267.6 | 06.05.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014US36932 | Priority number, date | US201313889622 | 08.05.2013 Original published format: US201313889622 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014182675 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994898 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/06 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
G07F7/069 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/11] | G07F7/06, G07F7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE WARENRÜCKGABEMASCHINEN | [2016/11] | English: | AUTOMATED ITEM RETURN MACHINES | [2016/11] | French: | MACHINES DE RETOUR AUTOMATISÉ D'ARTICLES | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 25.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011245965 (FARRELL PATRICK A [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2012246083 (BOWLES MARK [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * figure 6 *; | [XI]US2013046699 (BOWLES MARK VINCENT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12,15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 1c,6,7 * [I] 5-11,13,14 | International search | [A]KR20040082731 (SEO KYUNG KYU); | [Y]KR20070093376 (JANG OK [KR]); | [Y]US2011270439 (CABRERO GOMEZ ESTRELLA [ES], et al); | [Y]KR101081904B (ECO SAVE INC [KR]); | [A]US2013015240 (CHEN HORNG-JI [TW], et al) |