EP2995040 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR HIGH FIDELITY MULTI-MODAL OUT-OF-BAND BIOMETRIC AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. 383 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10179 / US | [2019/13] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. 270 Park Avenue New York, NY 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURSUN, Eren 383 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10179 / US | 02 /
FERNANDEZ, Gene 37 Schanck Road Holmdel, NJ, 07733 / US | 03 /
BERSON, Alex 7 Pebble Creek Road Sayton, NJ, 08810 / US | 04 /
GOODMAN, Brian 33 Station Road Redding, CT, 06896 / US | [2022/46] |
Former [2016/11] | 01 /
KURSUN, Eren 383 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10179 / US | Representative(s) | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard @ Friends Patentanwälte Maximilianstrasse 2 Palais an der Oper 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard @ Friends Patentanwälte Maximilianstrasse 2 am Palais an der Oper 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/11] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14794941.6 | 07.05.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014US37106 | Priority number, date | US201361820917P | 08.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361820917 P | US201361823669P | 15.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361823669 P | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 Original published format: US201313908618 | US201361844097P | 09.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361844097 P | US201313940799 | 12.07.2013 Original published format: US201313940799 | US201361860475P | 31.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361860475 P | US201313972556 | 21.08.2013 Original published format: US201313972556 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014182787 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2995040 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2995040 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, H04L9/40 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F21/35 (EP);
G06F21/40 (EP);
G06V40/18 (EP);
G06V40/45 (EP);
H04L63/0861 (EP);
G06F2221/2111 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | H04L9/32, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2016/11] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR HOCHZUVERLÄSSIGE BANDEXTERNER MULTIMODALE BIOMETRISCHE AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG | [2016/11] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR HIGH FIDELITY MULTI-MODAL OUT-OF-BAND BIOMETRIC AUTHENTICATION | [2016/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À L'AUTHENTIFICATION BIOMÉTRIQUE HORS BANDE MULTIMODE À HAUTE FIDÉLITÉ | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 16.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP22207658.0 / EP4156601 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 04.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | AT | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | IT | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | IE | 07.05.2023 | LU | 07.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
IE | 07.05.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
IE | 07.05.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005138391 (MANDALIA BAIJU D [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] *; | [X]WO2008055181 (CRYPTOMETRICS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0070] *; | [Y]WO2009067738 (WAVEFRONT BIOMETRIC TECHNOLOGI [AU], et al) [Y] 18-23* page 1 - page 5 *; | [X]WO2012164385 (AVIMIR IP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 11-17 * page 18 - page 25 *; | [Y]EP2560123 (DAON HOLDINGS LTD [KY]) [Y] 18-23 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * | International search | [Y]US5679940 (TEMPLETON RANDY JOE [US], et al); | [A]US2007283142 (MILSTEIN DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]US2008077660 (TOMIDA TAKAHIRO [JP]); | [Y]US2010251359 (SHIRAI KAZUHIKO [US], et al); | [Y]US2012204035 (CAMENISCH JAN L [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2012173655 (WEIK III MARTIN H [US]) | Examination | US7523067 |