EP3068170 - MILLIMETER WAVE DIRECTIONAL LINK SWITCHOVER METHOD, LINK SWITCHOVER IMPLEMENTATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/37] | MILLIMETER WAVE DIRECTIONAL LINK SWITCHOVER METHOD, LINK SWITCHOVER IMPLEMENTATION DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
[2019/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/49] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Qian ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Yang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
YU, Zhong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
ZHI, Zhou ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2016/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14795157.8 | 20.05.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014CN77899 | Priority number, date | CN201310544247 | 06.11.2013 Original published format: CN201310544247 | [2016/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014180378 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068170 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3068170 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
H04W36/302 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/04 (CN);
H04W36/033 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | H04W36/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MILLIMETERWELLEN-RICHTFUNKSCHALTVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER VERBINDUNGSUMSCHALTUNG | [2019/30] | English: | MILLIMETER WAVE DIRECTIONAL LINK SWITCHOVER METHOD, LINK SWITCHOVER IMPLEMENTATION DEVICE | [2019/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE BASCULEMENT DE LIAISON DIRECTIVE A ONDES MILLIMETRIQUES, DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE BASCULEMENT DE LIAISON | [2019/30] |
Former [2016/37] | MILLIMETERWELLEN-RICHTFUNKSCHALTVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER VERBINDUNGSUMSCHALTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | ||
Former [2016/37] | MILLIMETER WAVE DIRECTIONAL LINK SWITCHOVER METHOD, LINK SWITCHOVER IMPLEMENTATION DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
Former [2016/37] | PROCEDE DE BASCULEMENT DE LIAISON DIRECTIVE A ONDES MILLIMETRIQUES, DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE BASCULEMENT DE LIAISON, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2016 | Translation filed | 18.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 21.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2014 | AL | 04.12.2019 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | IE | 20.05.2020 | LU | 20.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1443667 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]US2006068719 (HAIRAPETIAN ARMOND [US]); | [A]EP2282575 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2499849 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]CN101159669 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101777997 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN102984743 (MAIPU COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |