EP3072153 - DEVICE HAVING A POWER ELECTRONICS MODULE FOR SUPPLYING AN ELECTRIC LOAD OF A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH ELECTRICAL SUPPLY VOLTAGE, HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKRIPPEK, Jörg Dyrotzer Winkel 1 14641 Wustermark / DE | 02 /
ALBAYRAK, Hasan Gökcer Avenue Charles de Gaulle 8 A 13469 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SEIDL, Rudolf Siebenbürgenerstrasse 33 93057 Regensburg / DE | [2016/39] | Application number, filing date | 14796113.0 | 11.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014EP74226 | Priority number, date | DE201310223430 | 18.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013223430 | [2016/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015071238 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3072153 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3072153 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/34, H01L23/373 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
H01L23/34 (EP);
H01L23/373 (EP);
H01L23/3735 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM LEISTUNGSELEKTRONIKMODUL ZUM VERSORGEN EINES ELEKTRISCHEN VERBRAUCHERS EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTS MIT ELEKTRISCHER VERSORGUNGSSPANNUNG, HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/39] | English: | DEVICE HAVING A POWER ELECTRONICS MODULE FOR SUPPLYING AN ELECTRIC LOAD OF A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH ELECTRICAL SUPPLY VOLTAGE, HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A DEVICE | [2016/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉQUIPÉ D'UN MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE DE PUISSANCE POUR FOURNIR UNE TENSION D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE À UN CONSOMMATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER, APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 13.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2014 | AL | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | MT | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH04273150 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]JPH07263621 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]US5747875 (OSHIMA SEIICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * figures 2, 4, 9 * * column 11, line 35 - column 12, line 24 * * column 14, line 15 - line 64 *; | [A]US5942797 (TERASAWA NORIHO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figure - * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 63 *; | [A]EP1455391 (SEMIKRON ELEKTRONIK GMBHPATENT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]DE102004040773 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] *; | [A]DE102004019431 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0067] *; | [Y]DE102006056363 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2009024345 (PRAUTZSCH HARALD [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0085] *; | [Y]US2009129432 (LUNIEWSKI PIOTR TOMASZ [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]DE102011080153 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] *; | [Y]DE102011088969 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031] * | by applicant | DE102007005233 | US2011133320 | DE102011007171 |