EP2914754 - NEW STRAIN OF LACTOBACILLUS DELBRUECKII BACTERIA AND ITS USE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BEE POLLEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instytut Biotechnologii Przemyslu Rolno-Spozywczego im.prof. Waclawa Dabrowskiego Ul. Rakowiecka 36 02-532 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | For all designated states Instytut Biotechnologii Przemyslu Rolno-Spozywczego Ul. Rakowiecka 36 02-532 Warszawa / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISIEWICZ, Anna Lechicka 7/ 3 02-156 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
KIELISZEK, Marek Orlat Lwowskich 4, 52 21-010 Leczna / PL | 03 /
CZARNIAK, Katarzyna Seczkowa, 65e 03-986 Warszawa / PL | [2015/37] | Representative(s) | Witek, Rafal WTS Patent Attorneys Witek, Sniezko & Partners ul. Weigla 12 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | Witek, Rafal WTS Patent Attorneys Witek, Sniezko & Partners ul. Rudolfa Weigla 12 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | Application number, filing date | 14796307.8 | 29.09.2014 | [2015/37] | WO2014PL50061 | Priority number, date | PL20130406622 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: PL 40662213 | [2015/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015093997 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2914754 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2914754 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, // C12R1/225 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A23L21/20 (EP);
A23L33/135 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12R2001/225 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/37] | C12R1/225, A23L1/076, A23L1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LACTOBACILLUS DELBRUECKII STAMM UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON BIENENPOLLEN | [2016/31] | English: | NEW STRAIN OF LACTOBACILLUS DELBRUECKII BACTERIA AND ITS USE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BEE POLLEN | [2015/37] | French: | SOUCHE DE LACTOBACILLUS DELBRUECKII ET SON UTILISATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE POLLEN D'ABEILLE | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/37] | NEUER STAMM VON LACTOBACILLUS DELBRUECKII-BAKTERIEN UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIENENPOLLEN | ||
Former [2015/37] | NOUVELLE SOUCHE DE BACTÉRIE LACTOBACILLUS DELBRUECKII ET SON UTILISATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE POLLEN D'ABEILLE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 11.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2014 | AL | 04.01.2017 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | IE | 29.09.2017 | LU | 29.09.2017 | MT | 29.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | FR | 02.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.09.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
TR | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 29.09.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 29.09.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.09.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008136730 (OLOFSSON TOBIAS [SE], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 10, line 31 - line 35 *; | [A]WO2008043161 (BALTADJIEVA MARIA [BG], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010058294 (GERVAIS DANONE SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - VASQUEZ ALEJANDRA ET AL, "The lactic acid bacteria involved in the production of bee pollen and bee bread", JOURNAL OF APICULTURAL RESEARCH, INTERNATIONAL BEE RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, CARDIFF, GB, vol. 48, no. 3, ISSN 0021-8839, (20090701), pages 189 - 195, XP008174033 [A] 1-3 * abstract * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3896/IBRA.1.48.3.07 |