EP3200818 - METHODS OF ISOLATING T CELL RECEPTORS HAVING ANTIGENIC SPECIFICITY FOR A CANCER-SPECIFIC MUTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6701 Rockledge Drive, Suite 700 MSC 7788 Bethesda, MD 20892-7788 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states The United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | ||
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6001 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAN, Eric 5411 McGrath Blvd. Apt. 1212 North Bethesda, Maryland 20852 / US | 02 /
LU, Yong-Chen 1620 East Jefferson, Apt 111 Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US | 03 /
ROBBINS, Paul E. 7907 Glendale Road Chevy Chase, Maryland 20815 / US | 04 /
ROSENBERG, Steven A. 10104 Iron Gate Road Potomac, Maryland 20854 / US | [2017/34] |
Former [2017/32] | 01 /
TRAN, Eric 5411 McGrath Blvd. Apt. 1212 North Bethesda, Maryland 20852 / US | ||
02 /
LU, Yong-Chen 1649 E Jefferson St. Apt. 202 Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US | |||
03 /
ROBBINS, Paul E. 7907 Glendale Road Chevy Chase, Maryland 20815 / US | |||
04 /
ROSENBERG, Steven A. 10104 Iron Gate Road Potomac, Maryland 20854 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Huenges, Martin Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/32] | Huenges, Martin Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14796317.7 | 02.10.2014 | [2017/32] | WO2014US58796 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016053338 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200818 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3200818 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K14/725, C07K14/47, C12N5/0783, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/0011 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN);
A61K39/4632 (EP,CN);
A61K39/464406 (EP,CN);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (EP,CN,US);
C12N5/0638 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6881 (US);
G01N33/56977 (US);
G01N33/6866 (US);
G01N33/6869 (US);
A61K2039/5156 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2239/51 (EP,CN);
A61K2239/52 (EP,CN);
C12N2501/505 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2501/998 (US);
C12N2502/99 (US);
C12N2510/00 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/156 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
G01N2333/4725 (US);
G01N2333/525 (US);
G01N2333/535 (US);
G01N2333/54 (US);
G01N2333/5406 (US);
G01N2333/5409 (US);
G01N2333/5425 (US);
G01N2333/5428 (US);
G01N2333/55 (US);
G01N2333/57 (US);
G01N2333/70596 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | A61K39/00, C07K14/725, C07K14/47, C12N5/0783 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON T-ZELL-REZEPTOREN MIT ANTIGENSPEZIFIZITÄT GEGEN EINE KREBSSPEZIFISCHE MUTATION | [2017/32] | English: | METHODS OF ISOLATING T CELL RECEPTORS HAVING ANTIGENIC SPECIFICITY FOR A CANCER-SPECIFIC MUTATION | [2017/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ISOLEMENT DE RÉCEPTEURS DES LYMPHOCYTES T PRÉSENTANT UNE SPÉCIFICITÉ ANTIGÉNIQUE POUR UNE MUTATION SPÉCIFIQUE DU CANCER | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 28.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2021 | 10.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22166152.3 / EP4074333 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2014 | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CY | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | MK | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IE | 02.10.2022 | LU | 02.10.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 02.10.2014 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.10.2014 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
LT | 08.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY] - E TRAN ET AL, "Cancer Immunotherapy Based on Mutation-Specific CD4+ T Cells in a Patient with Epithelial Cancer", SCIENCE, (20140508), vol. 344, no. 6184, doi:10.1126/science.1250498, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 641 - 645, XP055161453 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * [Y] 15-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1251102 | [ ] - E. TRAN ET AL, "Supplementary Materials for Cancer Immunotherapy Based on Mutation-Specific CD4+ T Cells in a Patient with Epithelial Cancer", SCIENCE, (20140508), vol. 344, no. 6184, doi:10.1126/science.1251102, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 641 - 645, XP055161464 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1251102 | [Y] - ERIC TRAN ET AL, "T-cell therapy against cancer mutations", ONCOTARGET, (20140719), pages 4579 - 4580, XP055193038 [Y] 15-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18632/oncotarget.2234 | by applicant | US8034334 | US2012244133 | US8383099 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. GENET. GENOMICS, (2011), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 95 - 109 | - VOELKERDING ET AL., CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 55, pages 641 - 658 | - RONAGHI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, no. 5375, pages 363 - 365 | - TURCOTTE ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2013), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 331 - 43 | - GROS ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2014), vol. 124, no. 5, pages 2246 - 59 | - DUDLEY ET AL., J IMMUNOTHER., (2003), vol. 26, pages 332 - 42 | - RIDDELL ET AL., J IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1990), vol. 128, pages 189 - 201 | - JONES ET AL., SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 330, pages 228 - 231 | - JIN ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHER., (2012), vol. 35, pages 283 - 292 | - DUDLEY ET AL., J CLIN. ONCOL., (2008), vol. 26, pages 5233 - 9 | - DUDLEY ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHER., (2003), vol. 26, pages 332 - 42 | - RIDDELL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, pages 238 - 41 | - ROBBINS ET AL., NAT. MED., (2013), vol. 19, pages 747 - 52 | - JONES ET AL., SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 330, pages 228 - 31 | - HOOF ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (2009), vol. 61, pages 1 - 13 |