EP3066306 - TURBINE AIRFOIL WITH LATERALLY EXTENDING SNUBBER HAVING INTERNAL COOLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCRIBNER, Carmen Andrew 903 Lyndley Dr Fort Mill, SC, 29708 / US | 02 /
MESSMANN, Stephen John 14214 Arbor Ridge Drive Charlotte, North Carolina 28273 / US | 03 /
MARSH, Jan H. 821 Bridgeway Boulevard Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/37] | 01 /
SCRIBNER, Carmen Andrew 13215 Steelecroft Parkway Apt. 209 Charlotte, North Carolina 28278 / US | ||
02 /
MESSMANN, Stephen John 14214 Arbor Ridge Drive Charlotte, North Carolina 28273 / US | |||
03 /
MARSH, Jan H. 821 Bridgeway Boulevard Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14796349.0 | 23.10.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014US61912 | Priority number, date | US201314074930 | 08.11.2013 Original published format: US201314074930 | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015069464 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066306 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/22, F01D5/18, F01D5/30 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/188 (US);
F01D5/22 (EP,US);
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | TURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT SICH SEITLICH ERSTRECKENDEM DÄMPFER MIT INNEREM KÜHLSYSTEM | [2016/37] | English: | TURBINE AIRFOIL WITH LATERALLY EXTENDING SNUBBER HAVING INTERNAL COOLING SYSTEM | [2016/37] | French: | AUBE DE TURBINE À AMORTISSEUR S'ÉTENDANT LATÉRALEMENT AYANT UN SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT INTERNE | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 18.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]EP0036044 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [I] 1-3 * page 3, line 15 - line 16; figure 2 * [A] 6-13; | [XAI]US2011194943 (MAYER CLINTON A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * page 3, paragraph 37 - page 4, paragraph 50; figures 2-4 * [A] 6-13 [I] 3,5; | [A]US2012027616 (MERRILL GARY B [US], et al) [A] 1-13* figures 1-3 * |