EP3068329 - RESECTOSCOPE HAVING A LASER FIBRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Winter & Ibe GmbH Kuehnstraße 61 22045 Hamburg / DE | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPFERMANN, Nils Schimmelmannstr. 54a 22043 Hamburg / DE | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Hausfeld, Norbert Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Beselerstraße 6 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Hausfeld, Norbert Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Beselerstraße 6 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14796704.6 | 29.10.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014EP02905 | Priority number, date | DE20131018972 | 14.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013018972 | [2016/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015070951 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068329 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/22 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A61B18/149 (EP,US);
A61B1/0014 (US);
A61B1/00087 (US);
A61B1/307 (US);
A61B18/24 (US);
A61B2018/00547 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Title | German: | RESEKTOSKOP MIT LASERFASER | [2016/38] | English: | RESECTOSCOPE HAVING A LASER FIBRE | [2016/38] | French: | RÉSECTOSCOPE AVEC FIBRE LASER | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 23.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19618399 (WINTER & IBE OLYMPUS [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002161358 (LIU CLIFFORD M [US], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [AD]DE102004007120 (MARTIN PFEIL TRAWID GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19618399 | DE19826311 | DE102004007120 | WO2008133707 | DE202011051869U | DE102012023275 |