EP3050008 - BREED-TARGETED ORDERING AND DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR PET FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tailsco Limited 25 Kew Foot Road Richmond upon Thames, Surrey TS9 2SS / GB | [2018/18] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states Tailsco Limited 25 Kew Foot Road Richmond upon Thames, Surrey TS9 2SS / GB | ||
For all designated states Bosher, Graham 34 Marina Place Hampton Wick Kingston upon Thames, Surrey KT1 4BH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSHER, Graham 34 Marina Place Hampton Wick Kingston upon Thames Surrey KT1 4BH / GB | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | HGF Cavendish House 39-41 Waterloo Street Birmingham, West Midlands B2 5PP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14796835.8 | 23.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014GB52885 | Priority number, date | GB20130016846 | 23.09.2013 Original published format: GB 201316846 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015040431 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050008 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q50/00 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0637 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | BESTELL- UND ABGABESYSTEM FÜR HAUSTIERFUTTER FÜR VERSCHIEDENE TIERARTEN | [2016/31] | English: | BREED-TARGETED ORDERING AND DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR PET FOOD | [2016/31] | French: | COMMANDE CIBLÉE PAR RACE ET SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION D'ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2003004655 (SINGH BHAJMOHAN RICKY [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] *; | [I]US2009299149 (ITO MASAMI [JP]) [I] 1-5* abstract * | Examination | WO0041575 | US2009127259 | US2011160902 |