EP2999159 - SAFETY CONTROL METHOD FOR CLOUD STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tianjin Sursen Investment Corp Ltd. 2F Building 9 Airport Business Park No. 80 Huanhe North Road Airport Economic Area Tianjin 300308 / CN | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONGLIN, Wang Floor 2 Building 9 Airport Business Park No.80 Huanhe North Road, Airport Economic Area Tianjin 300308 / CN | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Walsh, Marie Goretti, et al Hanna Moore + Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2, D02 T668 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14797382.0 | 16.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014CN77686 | Priority number, date | CN201310186144 | 17.05.2013 Original published format: CN201310186144 | [2016/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014183671 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999159 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, G06F12/14, H04L9/08 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
H04L9/0891 (EP);
G06F21/6209 (EP);
H04L9/0863 (EP);
G06F2221/2131 (EP);
H04L9/0822 (EP);
H04L9/3226 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE CLOUD-SPEICHERUNG | [2016/12] | English: | SAFETY CONTROL METHOD FOR CLOUD STORAGE | [2016/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SÉCURITÉ POUR STOCKAGE EN NUAGE | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2015 | Translation filed | 17.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 26.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012144909 (INVENIA AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-9 * pages 18-20; figures 4-7 *; | [Y]US6360322 (GRAWROCK DAVID [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 5, lines 43-60; figures 2-4 * * column 6, lines 9-28 * * column 7, lines 17-27 * * column 9, line 30 - column 10, line 31; figure 6 *; | [A]US7010689 (MATYAS JR STEPHEN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 13, line 9 - column 14, line 51; figure 10 * | International search | [Y]CN101145911 (UNIV JIANGHAN [CN]); | [A]CN101465727 (CHENGDU HUAWEI SYMANTEC TECH [CN]); | [A]US2009288143 (STEBILA DOUGLAS J [CA], et al); | [A]CN101924739 (BEIJING GLOBAL JULANG NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [Y]CN102629940 (TIANJIN SURSEN INVEST CO LTD); | [Y]CN103107989 (GAO JIANQING); | [XP]CN103236934 (TIANJIN SCHOLAR INVEST CO LTD); | [AP]CN103391187 (TIANJIN SHUSHENG INVEST CO LTD) |