EP2997122 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REMOVING CERIA PARTICLES FROM A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entegris, Inc. 129 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states Entegris, Inc. 129 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | ||
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states Advanced Technology Materials, Inc. 7 Commerce Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jun 13 Locust Lane Unit 48 Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | 02 /
SUN, Laisheng 15 Scuppop Road, Unit 804 Danbury, CT 06811 / US | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 14797546.0 | 15.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014US38125 | Priority number, date | US201361824714P | 17.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361824714 P | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014186538 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997122 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3105 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/0042 (EP,US);
C11D1/008 (US);
C11D3/2072 (US);
C11D3/2086 (US);
C11D3/2096 (US);
C11D3/30 (EP,US);
C11D3/33 (EP,US);
H01L21/02057 (US);
H01L21/02065 (EP,US);
C11D2111/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | C11D3/26, C11D3/00, C11D1/00, C09K3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON CEROXIDTEILCHEN VON EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2016/12] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REMOVING CERIA PARTICLES FROM A SURFACE | [2016/12] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ÉLIMINER DES PARTICULES D'OXYDE DE CÉRIUM D'UNE SURFACE | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1381663 (ESC INC [US]) [X] 1,3-10,14 * Formulations A-C, E-J, O, P, T, U, X; paragraphs [0023] - [0034] * [I] 2; | [XI]US2008076688 (BARNES JEFFREY A [US], et al) [X] 1-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0089] , [0091] , [0092] , [0151] , [0155] - [0162] - [0187] - [0195] - [0197] , [0210] - [0215] - [0222] , [0227]; claims 1,19 * [I] 11-13; | [XI]US2009239777 (ANGST DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-10,14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0037] , [0038] , [0058] , [0061] , [0063] - [0070] - [0075] * [I] 11-13,15; | [I]US7919446 (FRESCO ZACHARY M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 1, line 53 - column 6, line 36 *; | [XP]EP2687589 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US]) [XP] 1-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0069] - [0080] - [0 87] *; | [E]WO2014176193 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US]) [E] 1-10,14,15* paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0038] - [0040] - [0042] , [0046] , [0047] * | International search | [A]US2002077259 (SKEE DAVID C [US]); | [A]US2003171233 (ABE YUMIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2006166847 (WALKER ELIZABETH [US], et al); | [X]US2008076688 (BARNES JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [X]US2009239777 (ANGST DAVID [US], et al) |