EP2997684 - USING NOISY WINDOW FOR UNCALIBRATED OPTICAL NETWORK UNIT ACTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza No. 55 Keji South Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | For all designated states ZTE (USA) Inc. 2425 North Central Expressway Suite 800 Richardson, Texas 75080 / US | [2017/26] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza No. 55 Keji South Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
For all designated states ZTE (USA) Inc. 7000 North Mopac Expressway 2nd Floor, Suite 2105 Austin, Texas 78731 / US | |||
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
For all designated states ZTE (USA) Inc. 7000 North Mopac Expressway 2nd Floor, Suite 2105 Austin, Texas 78731 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
A. KHOTIMSKY, Denis 27 Glen Street Westborough, Massachusetts 01581 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Songlin No. 889 Bibo Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Dezhi No. 889 Bibo Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14798367.0 | 24.03.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014CN73972 | Priority number, date | WO2013CN75661 | 15.05.2013 Original published format: PCT/CN2013/075661 | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014183504 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997684 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2997684 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04J14/08, H04B10/25, H04B10/272 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
H04B10/272 (EP,US);
H04J14/0221 (US);
H04J14/025 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | H04J14/02, H04J14/08, H04B10/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES VERRAUSCHTEN FENSTERS ZUR AKTIVIERUNG EINER UNKALIBRIERTEN OPTISCHEN NETZWERKEINHEIT | [2016/12] | English: | USING NOISY WINDOW FOR UNCALIBRATED OPTICAL NETWORK UNIT ACTIVATION | [2016/12] | French: | UTILISATION DE FENÊTRE DE BRUIT POUR ACTIVER UNE UNITÉ DE RÉSEAU OPTIQUE NON CALIBRÉE | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 16.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2014 | AL | 31.10.2018 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | IT | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | RS | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | IE | 24.03.2019 | LU | 24.03.2019 | MT | 24.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.03.2014 | |
AL | 31.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.03.2019 | ||
MT | 24.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.03.2019 | ||
MT | 24.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.03.2019 | ||
MT | 24.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007237523 (MIGUEL JOSEPH D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] * * claim 1 * * figure 3B *; | [A]US2010098413 (LI WEIDONG RICK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] - [0047] , [0049] * * claims 1-6 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2011255866 (VAN VEEN DOUTJE T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0030] - [0043]; figures 3a-3f *; | [A]EP2541822 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] * * figures 6,7 * | International search | [A]WO2010111954 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]CN101944949 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102223586 (ZTE CORP) |