EP3069290 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO OR THE EXIT FROM AN AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemia Identity & Security France 11 Boulevard Galliéni 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2018/35] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Morpho 11 Boulevard Galliéni 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Laurent Morpho 11 Boulevard Gallieni F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | 02 /
TOURET, Olivier Morpho 11 Boulevard Gallieni F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | 03 /
CHASTEL, Pierre Morpho 11 Boulevard Gallieni F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 14798815.8 | 12.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014EP74395 | Priority number, date | FR20130061019 | 12.11.2013 Original published format: FR 1361019 | [2016/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015071325 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3069290 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3069290 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/29] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3069290 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06F21/34, G07C9/00, G06F17/30 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G07C9/37 (EP,US);
G06F16/955 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G07C9/00 (US);
G07C9/00563 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | G06F21/32, G06F21/34, G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES ZUGANGS ZU ODER AUSGANG AUS EINEM BEREICH | [2016/38] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO OR THE EXIT FROM AN AREA | [2016/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONTROLE LORS DE L'ACCES OU LA SORTIE D'UNE ZONE | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | DK | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | ES | 18.07.2018 | FI | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | IT | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | MT | 18.07.2018 | NL | 18.07.2018 | PT | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | RS | 18.07.2018 | SE | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | NO | 18.10.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | GB | 12.11.2018 | IE | 12.11.2018 | LU | 12.11.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PT | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
GB | 12.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 18.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006041416 (STRATECH SYSTEMS LTD [SG], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * pages 1-3 * * pages 6,11-12 * * page 16 * * figures 1-7 *; | [XI]WO2009128060 (ZIGMAN YAFIT [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,11-19 * abstract * * pages 5-7 * * pages 9-13 * * claims 1-39 * * figure 1 * [I] 5-10; | [A]US2012213417 (KOCHER JR ROBERT WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0018] ** figures 1-2 * |