EP3068259 - APPLICATOR WITH A ROTATING ROD FOR A COSMETIC PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANCHEZ, Marcel 23 Rue du Maréchal Foch 93600 Aulnay Sous Bois / FR | 02 /
CAULIER, Eric 59 Rue du Général Leclerc 60420 Maignelay / FR | 03 /
THENIN, Audrey 6 Rue Fleury Panckouke 92190 Meudon / FR | 04 /
ANNONAY, Wendy 118 Boulevard Ney 75018 Paris / FR | 05 /
BEFVE, Denis 8 Voie Coquel 62000 Arras / FR | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 14798818.2 | 12.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014EP74399 | Priority number, date | FR20130061225 | 15.11.2013 Original published format: FR 1361225 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015071328 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068259 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A45D40/26 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A45D34/045 (EP,US);
A45D40/267 (US);
A45D40/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Title | German: | APPLIKATOR MIT EINEM ROTIERENDEN STAB FÜR EIN KOSMETIKPRODUKT | [2016/38] | English: | APPLICATOR WITH A ROTATING ROD FOR A COSMETIC PRODUCT | [2016/38] | French: | APPLICATEUR DE PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE À TIGE PIVOTANTE | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 09.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006042647 (VOGEL SARAH [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10,11 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034]; figure - * [I] 5; | [X]EP2229838 (OEKAMETALL OEHLHORN GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,10* paragraphs [0042] - [0046]; figure - * |