EP3071048 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR COATING DRY PET FOOD KIBBLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2019/28] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKARD, Maquel 1107 Mississippi Ave. Unit 409 St. Louis, Missouri 63104 / US | 02 /
RAYNER, Michael G. 4904 Creek Crossing Dr. St. Joseph, Missouri 64507 / US | 03 /
RAYNER, Jean Luz 4904 Creek Crossing Dr. St.Joseph, Missouri 64507 / US | 04 /
HAUKAP, Peggy 5617 Schuetz Land Alhambra, Illinois 62001 / US | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14799217.6 | 12.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014IB65999 | Priority number, date | US201361905482P | 18.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361905482 P | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015071845 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3071048 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23K10/00, A23K10/10, A23K10/40, A23K50/00 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
A23K20/20 (EP,US);
A23K10/00 (RU);
A23K40/30 (EP,MX,US);
A23K40/25 (US);
A23K10/16 (EP,MX,US);
A23K10/20 (EP,MX,US);
A23K10/30 (EP,MX,US);
A23K20/163 (EP,MX,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,MX,US);
A23K20/179 (EP,MX,US);
A23K40/20 (US);
A23K50/42 (EP,MX,US);
A23K50/48 (EP,MX,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON HAUSTIERFUTTERNÄPFEN | [2016/39] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR COATING DRY PET FOOD KIBBLES | [2016/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ENROBAGE DE CROQUETTES SÈCHES POUR ANIMAUX DOMESTIQUES | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 21.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/20] | 11.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]GB1537209 (QUAKER OATS CO); | [A]US4822626 (SPANIER HENRY C [US], et al); | [I]WO0147371 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [I]US2003026875 (AGUILAR CARLOS A [US], et al); | [I]US6911224 (MAY STEPHEN [US], et al); | [I]WO2006074091 (HILLS PET NUTRITION INC [US], et al); | [I]US2008175957 (HORGAN MONIKA BARBARA [US], et al); | [XI]US2012034336 (WATELAIN ANNIE [FR], et al) |