EP3066001 - THREE-WHEELED TILTING BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/37] | TILTING MECHANISM FOR A MULTI-WHEELED TILTING VEHICLE | ||
[2020/07] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Butchers & Bicycles ApS Slagtehusgade 5A 1715 Copenhagen V / DK | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOGENSEN, Morten Tavlekærsvej 16 2650 Hvidovre / DK | 02 /
WAGENER, Morten Eriksgade 11 4th Floor 1708 Copenhagen V / DK | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2020/17] |
Former [2016/37] | Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 14799704.3 | 07.11.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014EP74050 | Priority number, date | DK20130000640 | 08.11.2013 Original published format: DK 201300640 | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015067760 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066001 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3066001 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B62K5/02, B62K5/08, B62K5/10, B62K7/04, B60G3/20, B60G21/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
B62K5/10 (EP,US);
B60G21/007 (EP,US);
B60G3/20 (EP);
B62D61/065 (US);
B62D9/02 (US);
B62K5/027 (US);
B62K5/05 (US);
B62K5/08 (EP,US);
B62K7/04 (EP,US);
B62M6/40 (US);
B60G2200/144 (EP);
B60G2300/122 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | B62K5/08, B62D9/02, B60G21/00, B60K5/10, B62K7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | 06.06.2016 | ME | 06.06.2016 | Title | German: | DREIRÄDRIGES NEIGEFAHRRAD | [2020/07] | English: | THREE-WHEELED TILTING BICYCLE | [2020/07] | French: | BICYCLETTE INCLINABLE À TROIS ROUES | [2020/07] |
Former [2016/37] | NEIGUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR EIN MEHRRÄDRIGES NEIGEFAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2016/37] | TILTING MECHANISM FOR A MULTI-WHEELED TILTING VEHICLE | ||
Former [2016/37] | MÉCANISME D'INCLINAISON POUR UN VÉHICULE D'INCLINAISON À ROUES MULTIPLES | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 20.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Observations by third parties | 28.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2020 | Observations by third parties | 09.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.03.2020 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2021
29.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE Babboe B.V. Koedijkerweg 12A 3816 BV Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob Inaday Patent B.V. Hengelosestraat 141 7521 AA Enschede / NL | [2021/10] | 04.02.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.06.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.06.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/48] | 29.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.07.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2014 | AL | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.11.2014 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008258416 (WILCOX JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0025] - [0038]; figures 1-5,7-10 * [I] 5; | [XDI]US7487985 (MIGHELL ROBERT [US]) [XD] 1-4,6-9 * column 2, line 17 - column 6, line 43; figures 1-6 *[I] 5 | Examination | US2010194068 | other | US5762351 | EP1090832 | DE102006039457 | JP2010042710 | US2010194068 | US2011248463 | Opposition | EP1090832 | DE102006039457 | JP2010042710 | US2010194068 | - Anonymous, "Simplified Concept for Tilting Trike", Mean lean machine, (20130725), pages 1 - 3, Mean lean machine, URL: http://www.meanleanmachine.com/blog/leaning-reverse-trike-design/simplified-concept-for-tilting-trike/, (20220715), XP055943176 | - Horwitz Ricky, "Recumbent Trike Design Primer The Recumbent Trike Design Primer", Hell-Bent, (20100101), pages 1 - 37, Hell-Bent, URL: https://www.ethicallogistics.org/Bikes/Recumbent%20Trike%20Design%20Primer.pdf, (20220715), XP055943185 | - Anonymous, "The Left-handed Cyclist: The Drymer and Varna Lean Forward", the lefthanded cyclist, (20120207), pages 1 - 6, the lefthanded cyclist, URL: http://lefthandedcyclist.blogspot.com/2012/02/drymer-and-varna-lean-forward.html, (20220715), XP055943187 | - Lost de Drymer uit Stadskanaal het fileprobleem op?, (20120615), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=gHSIxgmmeZs |