EP3068888 - RNA TRANSCRIPTION VECTOR AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vrije Universiteit Brussel Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIRMAN, Carlo Prinsenmeers 29 B-9200 Dendermonde / BE | 02 /
THIELEMANS, Kristiaan Oudestraat 37 B-2610 Antwerpen / BE | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | LC Patents Kempische Steenweg 542A 3500 Hasselt / BE | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 14799996.5 | 12.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014EP74349 | Priority number, date | EP20130192555 | 12.11.2013 Original published format: EP 13192555 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015071295 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068888 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3068888 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/85, A61K39/00, A61K31/7088 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/7105 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K48/0066 (EA,KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,EA);
A61P31/04 (EP,EA);
A61P31/10 (EP,EA);
A61P31/12 (EP,EA);
A61P31/18 (EP,EA);
A61P35/00 (EP,EA);
A61P37/08 (EP,EA);
C07K14/70575 (EA,KR,US);
C07K14/70596 (EA,KR,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C12N2320/52 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C12N2810/10 (EA,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RNA-TRANSKRIPTIONSVEKTOREN UND VERWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2017/35] | English: | RNA TRANSCRIPTION VECTOR AND USES THEREOF | [2016/38] | French: | VECTEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION D'ARN ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2016/38] |
Former [2016/38] | RNA-TRANSKRIPTIONSVEKTOREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18153133.6 / EP3336192 | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2019/33] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | HR | 31.01.2018 | |
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | HR | 31.01.2018 | |
LT | 31.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0155369 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al); | [A]US2004043468 (MAURO VINCENT P [US], et al); | JP2007295846 [ ] (KANEKA CORP, et al); | [AD]WO2009034172 (UNIV BRUXELLES [BE], et al); | [A]WO2009075886 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al); |