EP3006971 - FUNCTIONAL SHEET WITH PROTECTIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | For all designated states MGC Filsheet Co., Ltd. 4-2242, Mikajima Tokorozawa-city, Saitama 359-1164 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Ryuji c/o MGC Filsheet Co. Ltd. 4-2242, Mikajima Tokorozawa-city, Saitama 359-1164 / JP | 02 /
TAKANO, Toshihiko c/o MGC Filsheet Co. Ltd. 4-2242, Mikajima Tokorozawa-city, Saitama 359-1164 / JP | 03 /
SASAGAWA, Taisuke c/o MGC Filsheet Co. Ltd. 4-2242, Mikajima Tokorozawa-city, Saitama 359-1164 / JP | 04 /
NAKAYAMA, Tomomi c/o MGC Filsheet Co. Ltd. 4-2242, Mikajima Tokorozawa-city, Saitama 359-1164 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14801502.7 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP63469 | Priority number, date | JP20130109822 | 24.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013109822 | JP20130244726 | 27.11.2013 Original published format: JP 2013244726 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014189078 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006971 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006971 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, B29C45/14, B29C53/04, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, G02C7/10, B29L11/00, B32B27/20 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
B32B7/027 (EP,US);
G02B1/14 (US);
B29C45/14811 (EP,US);
B29D11/00009 (EP,US);
B29D11/00644 (EP,US);
B29D11/0073 (EP);
B32B1/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/06 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
G02B1/041 (US);
G02B5/23 (US);
G02B5/3033 (EP,US);
G02B5/305 (US);
G02C7/10 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (US);
B29K2025/08 (US);
B29K2029/04 (US);
B29K2069/00 (US);
B29K2629/04 (EP,US);
B29K2669/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0034 (EP,US);
B29L2011/0016 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/05 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2274/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/42 (EP,US);
B32B2307/738 (EP,US);
B32B2551/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | G02B5/30, B29C45/14, B29C53/04, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, G02C7/10, B29L11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKTIONSFOLIE MIT EINEM SCHUTZFILM | [2016/15] | English: | FUNCTIONAL SHEET WITH PROTECTIVE FILM | [2016/15] | French: | FEUILLE FONCTIONNELLE DOTÉE D'UN FILM PROTECTEUR | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2015 | Translation filed | 30.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 09.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2014 | AL | 11.11.2020 | AT | 11.11.2020 | CY | 11.11.2020 | CZ | 11.11.2020 | DK | 11.11.2020 | EE | 11.11.2020 | FI | 11.11.2020 | HR | 11.11.2020 | LT | 11.11.2020 | LV | 11.11.2020 | MC | 11.11.2020 | MK | 11.11.2020 | MT | 11.11.2020 | PL | 11.11.2020 | RO | 11.11.2020 | RS | 11.11.2020 | SE | 11.11.2020 | SI | 11.11.2020 | SK | 11.11.2020 | SM | 11.11.2020 | BG | 11.02.2021 | NO | 11.02.2021 | GR | 12.02.2021 | IS | 11.03.2021 | PT | 11.03.2021 | IE | 21.05.2021 | LU | 21.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 11.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]JP2003145616 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [YD] 1-3,6-9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 13] , [0 15] - [0017] - [0 27] - [0036]; claims 1-5 * [A] 4,5,10,11; | [A]US2010189999 (KIMURA YOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [YA]JP2011037243 (MITSUI CHEMICALS TOHCELLO INC) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 16] - [0018] - [0 22] - [0024] - [0 28] , [0 41] * [A] 4,5,10,11; | [YA]WO2013051723 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 6-9 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,10,11; | US2014375945 [ ] (TOKUMARU TERUTAKA [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0054] - [0058] * | International search | [A]JPH06148431 (FUJIMORI KOGYO CO); | [A]JPH06160630 (FUJIMORI KOGYO CO); | [Y]JP2003145616 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2011037243 (MITSUI CHEMICALS TOHCELLO INC); | [Y]WO2013051723 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003145616 | JP2011110879 |