EP3039471 - PROJECTION TYPE IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE AND PROJECTION OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKAWA, Jun c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14802956.4 | 13.11.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014JP05708 | Priority number, date | JP20130273229 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013273229 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015097970 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039471 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/16, G02B17/08 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
G03B21/142 (EP,US);
G03B21/206 (CN);
G02B13/16 (EP,US);
G02B15/1421 (EP,CN,US);
G02B15/1425 (EP,CN,US);
G02B17/08 (EP,US);
G02B17/0852 (EP,US);
G03B21/005 (US);
G03B21/147 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSARTIGES BILDANZEIGESYSTEM UND OPTISCHES PROJEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2016/27] | English: | PROJECTION TYPE IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE AND PROJECTION OPTICAL SYSTEM | [2016/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE DE TYPE À PROJECTION ET SYSTÈME OPTIQUE DE PROJECTION | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 23.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JP2010020036 (CANON KK) [X] 1,4,5,8,12,13,18-20 * abstract * [Y] 7,9,15,17 [I] 2,3,10,11,14; | [XY]US2012147341 (TSUKAGOSHI SHINICHI [JP]) [X] 19 * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] - [0029] - [0041]; figures 1-4,7 * [Y] 1-6,8,10-13,16,18,20; | [Y]US5701205 (HASUSHITA SACHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,8,10-13,16,18,20 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 35; figures 1-5b * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 14 *; | [Y]US2008198338 (YOKOTE YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 7,9,15,17 * paragraphs [0059] - [0062]; figures 11a,11b * | Examination | US2010128234 |