EP3066084 - TRIAZOLE INTERMEDIATES USEFUL IN THE SYNTHESIS OF PROTECTED N-ALKYLTRIAZOLECARBALDEHYDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medivation Technologies, Inc. 525 Market Street, 36th Floor San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Mark 369 Elm Aenue Larkspur, CA 94939 / US | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14803014.1 | 06.11.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014US64273 | Priority number, date | US201361901300P | 07.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361901300 P | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015069851 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066084 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, C07D249/10, C07D405/06 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D249/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | C07D249/08, C07D249/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | ZUR SYNTHESE VON GESCHÜTZTEN N-ALKYLTRIAZOLCARBALDEHYDESTRIAZOLEN NÜTZLICHE ZWISCHENPRODUKTE | [2016/37] | English: | TRIAZOLE INTERMEDIATES USEFUL IN THE SYNTHESIS OF PROTECTED N-ALKYLTRIAZOLECARBALDEHYDES | [2016/37] | French: | INTERMÉDIAIRES DE TRIAZOLE UTILES DANS LA SYNTHÈSE DE N-ALKYLTRIAZOLECARBALDÉHYDE PROTÉGÉS | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 30.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDAI]WO2008135826 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [XD] 1,2,5-7 * page 158, lines 1-16 * [A] 8-21 [I] 3,4; | [XDAI]WO2004024691 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [XD] 1-3,6,7 * page 37, lines 1-12 * [A] 8-21 [I] 4,5 | by applicant | US2009318436 | WO2004024691 | WO2008135826 | WO2005080356 | WO03002567 | WO2010017055 | WO2011097602 |