EP3005766 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VISITING SUBSCRIBER SERVER IN IMS CORE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitel Mobility Inc. 1700 International Parkway, Suite 200 Richardson TX 75081 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLIS, Michael, Brett 6320 Blackstone Drive McKinney, TX 75070 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14804010.8 | 06.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US37024 | Priority number, date | US201361829843P | 31.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361829843 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014193615 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005766 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/08, H04L29/06, H04W8/12, H04W12/04, H04W12/06 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/1073 (EP,US);
H04L65/1095 (EP);
H04W8/12 (EP,US);
H04W12/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | H04W12/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR VISITING-SUBSCRIBER-SERVER IN IMS-KERNNETZWERKEN | [2016/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VISITING SUBSCRIBER SERVER IN IMS CORE NETWORKS | [2016/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SERVEUR D'ABONNÉS EN VISITE DANS LES RÉSEAUX CENTRAUX IMS | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 06.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010290403 (LINDHOLM FREDRIK [SE], et al) [X] 1-9,15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0034]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0066] * [I] 10-14; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; IP Multimedia (IM) Subsystem Sh interface; Signalling flows and message contents (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 29.328, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20130313), vol. CT WG4, no. V11.7.0, pages 1 - 60, XP050692121 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [07.1] * * page 40, paragraph C.1 - page 42, paragraph C.2 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; IP Multimedia (IM) Subsystem Cx and Dx interfaces; Signalling flows and message contents (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 29.228, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20130312), vol. CT WG4, no. V11.7.0, pages 1 - 73, XP050692003 [A] 10-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008267199 (SMITH IAN [IE], et al); | [Y]US2010048175 (OSBORN CHRISTOPHER MARTIN EDWARD [US]); | [A]US2010177780 (OPHIR SHAI [IL], et al); | [X]US2010290403 (LINDHOLM FREDRIK [SE], et al); | [A]US2011305196 (KUROKAWA OSAMU [JP], et al) |