EP3005932 - INSERTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAITO, Kimihiko OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/08] |
Former [2016/43] | 01 /
NAITO, Kimihiko OLYMPUS CORPORATION Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
NAITO, Kimihiko c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14804755.8 | 13.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP62710 | Priority number, date | JP20130113936 | 30.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013113936 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014192537 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005932 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61B1/0016 (EP,US);
A61B1/00071 (EP,US);
A61B1/00148 (EP);
A61B1/00156 (EP,US);
G02B23/2476 (EP,US);
A61B1/00066 (EP,US);
A61B1/00135 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | EINSETZVORRICHTUNG | [2016/15] | English: | INSERTION DEVICE | [2016/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2015 | Translation filed | 09.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 26.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 09.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009209812 (OMOTO KEIJIRO [JP]) [X] 1,5,7-12,14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0048] , [0 69] , [0 80] * * figures 1, 2, 6, 8 * [I] 2-4,13; | [XI]US2013102848 (MORIYAMA HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,10,11,14 * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0131] - [0142] * * figures 1, 4, 14, 15 * [I] 2-4; | [E]EP2832284 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [E] 1,11,14 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] * * figure 1 * | International search | [X]JP2009189653 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [A]WO2011140118 (SPIRUS MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [A]JP2005288035 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2011027986 (OLYMPUS CORP) | by applicant | US2012029281 |