EP3005068 - TAP AND HOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eBay Inc. 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | [2023/22] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states eBay Inc. 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GURA, Ron 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | 02 /
BAR, Matanya 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | 03 /
DICKMAN, Erez 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/22] |
Former [2016/15] | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14804869.7 | 06.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US36978 | Priority number, date | US201361828567P | 29.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361828567 P | US201314084317 | 19.11.2013 Original published format: US201314084317 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014193614 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005068 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3005068 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/32, G06Q30/0601 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
G06Q20/322 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/326 (EP);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | G06F3/0488, G06Q30/06, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/32 | ||
Former IPC [2016/15] | G06F3/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIPPEN UND HALTEN | [2023/11] | English: | TAP AND HOLD | [2016/15] | French: | PRESSION ET MAINTIEN | [2016/15] |
Former [2016/15] | HAHN UND HALTER | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 13.05.2020 | Appeal received No. T1589/20 | 13.07.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.11.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 06.02.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 23.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010145861 (LAW RINGO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010332351 (STONE CARL [US]) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2011282785 (CHIN DAVID H [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US8136724 (AIDASANI DILIP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2010145861 (LAW RINGO [US], et al); | [Y]US2011282785 (CHIN DAVID H [US]); | [Y]US2012226983 (GOLDENBERG JOSHUA [US], et al); | [Y]US2012254808 (GILDFIND ANDREW [GB]) |