EP3213519 - VIDEO STREAM SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OPSENICA, Miljenko Keskiyöntie 11 D 02210 Espoo / FI | 02 /
WANG, Le Erik Tulindberginkuja 2B 36 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2018/28] |
Former [2017/36] | 01 /
OPSENICA, Miljenko Keskiyöntie 11 D FI-02210 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
WANG, Le Erik Tulindberginkuja 2B 36 FI-00180 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 14805375.4 | 31.10.2014 | [2017/36] | WO2014SE51290 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016068768 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213519 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3213519 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/43, H04B10/116 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/4305 (US);
H04B10/116 (US);
H04L43/04 (US);
H04N21/4302 (EP,US);
H04W56/0015 (US);
H04W72/1263 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOSTROM-SYNCHRONISATION | [2018/17] | English: | VIDEO STREAM SYNCHRONIZATION | [2017/36] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION DE FLUX VIDÉO | [2017/36] |
Former [2017/36] | VIDEO-STREAMING-SYNCHRONISIERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 13.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2014 | AL | 11.07.2018 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | NL | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | PT | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | IE | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | LU | 31.10.2018 | MT | 31.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.10.2018 | ||
MT | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.10.2018 | ||
MT | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.10.2018 | ||
MT | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | |
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 11.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2134080 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 2,4,10,12,15,17,24,30 * paragraphs [0079] , [0 95] *; | [XI]WO2013089769 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,14,20-23,25,26,28,29,32,34,35,37 * abstract * * page 6, lines 19-22 * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 17 * * page 14, lines 6-9 * [I] 2-6,10-13,15-19,24,27,30,31,33,36; | [A]EP2713609 (STOCKHOLMS UNI HOLDING AB [SE]) [A] 1-37 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0116] ** paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0125] *; | [A]US2014113598 (CONTI CHRIS [US]) [A] 3,5,6,13,16,18,19,31 * paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US2014270796 (JOVICIC ALEKSANDAR [US], et al) [A] 2,4,10,12,15,17,24,30 * figure 5a * * paragraphs [0067] - [0070] * | by applicant | US2011043691 |