EP3074423 - ANTIBODIES ANTI MATRIPTASE FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford BioTherapeutics Ltd 94A Innovation Drive Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RZ / GB | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRETT, Jonathan Oxford BioTherapeutics Inc San Jose Biocenter 5941 Optical Court San Jose, California CA95138 / US | 02 /
RAO-NAIK, Chetana Bristol-Myers Squibb Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Haichun Bristol-Myers Squibb Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | 04 /
POGUE, Sarah Bristol-Myers Squibb Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | 05 /
MEADDOUGH, Erika Bristol-Myers Squibb Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | 06 /
KUHNE, Michelle Bristol-Myers Squibb Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | 07 /
PAN, Chin Bristol-Myers Squibb Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 14805644.3 | 25.11.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014GB53470 | Priority number, date | US201361908371P | 25.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361908371 P | [2016/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015075477 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3074423 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, C07K16/40, A61K39/00 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/68031 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6869 (EP,US);
A61K47/6871 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/3015 (US);
C07K16/3046 (US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/31 (US);
C07K2317/34 (US);
C07K2317/565 (KR,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN MATRIPTASE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2016/40] | English: | ANTIBODIES ANTI MATRIPTASE FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2016/40] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-MATRIPTASE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2009020645 (OXFORD GENOME SCIENCES UK LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2011063127 (UNIV NEW JERSEY MED [US], et al) |