EP3096633 - INSECT PRODUCTS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dossey, Aaron T. 2211 Snapper Ln Midwest City, OK 73130 / US | [2024/04] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Dossey, Aaron T. 120 Mark Twain Circle Apt. No. L5 Athens, Georgia 30605-6613 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2016/48] | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14805739.1 | 11.11.2014 | [2016/48] | WO2014US64920 | Priority number, date | US201361902346P | 11.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361902346 P | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015070194 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096633 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3096633 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/00, A23L3/40, A23J3/22, A23K10/00, A23L29/275, A23L35/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
A23L35/00 (EP,US);
A23J3/227 (EP,US);
A23K10/00 (EP,US);
A23L29/275 (EP,US);
A23L3/00 (EP,US);
A23L3/40 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | A23K10/00, A23L5/00, A23L29/275, A23L35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSEKTENPRODUKTE, METHODEN IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2023/26] | English: | INSECT PRODUCTS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF | [2016/48] | French: | PRODUITS D`INSECTES, MÉTHODES DE FABRICATION ET SES UTILISATION | [2023/26] |
Former [2016/48] | INSEKTENPRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2016/48] | PRODUITS À BASE D'INSECTES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2016/48] | 09.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2022 | Observations by third parties | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 09.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 09.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 09.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2016 | Decision despatched | 19.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 09.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | CN101406295 [ ]; | CN1452902 [ ]; | JP2004033203 [ ]; | [X]GB2177588 (FAAP SA SOC); | [XI]CN1145227 (SUN JIN [CN]); | [X]EP0913407 (DIRECTOR GENERAL OF FRUIT TREE [JP]); | [A]US2003170887 (IMANISHI SHIGEO [JP], et al); | [XI]CN1452902 (LI ZHAOMING [CN]); | [XI]JP2004033203 (HIROI YOSUKE); | [XI]CN101406295 (XINGKUN ZHAO [CN]) | Examination | EP2953487 | other | WO2014123420 |