EP3066069 - METHOD FOR SYNTHESISING ESTERS AND CATALYST FOR SAID SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pivert Parc Technologique des Rives de l'Oise Rue Les Rives de l'Oise 60280 Venette / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Université des Sciences et Technologies de Lille 1 Cité Scientifique 59655 Villeneuve-d'Ascq Cedex / FR | For all designated states Ecole Centrale de Lille Cité Scientifique Boulevard Paul Langevin 59651 Villeneuve D' Ascq / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states Pivert Parc Technologique des Rives de l'Oise Rue Les Rives de l'Oise 60280 Venette / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
For all designated states Université des Sciences et Technologies de Lille 1 Cité Scientifique 59655 Villeneuve-d'Ascq Cedex / FR | |||
For all designated states Ecole Centrale de Lille Cité Scientifique Boulevard Paul Langevin 59651 Villeneuve D' Ascq / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUMEIGNIL, Franck 20, avenue des Cottages 59491 VILLENEUVE D'ASCQ / FR | 02 /
DESSET, Simon 65 Rue Gantois Maison 2 F-59000 Lille / FR | 03 /
PAUL, Sébastien 58 Rue du Rieu F-59158 Thun Saint Amand / FR | 04 /
RAFFA, Guillaume Les Logis de la Rose Chemin de la Flachardière F-69610 Les Halles / FR | 05 /
ZHANG, Lei Résidence Léonard de Vinci - E 324 Boulevard Paul Langevin F-59650 Villeneuve D'ascq / FR | [2016/42] |
Former [2016/37] | 01 /
DUMEIGNIL, Franck 18 Rue de l'Abbé Bonpain Apt 6 59273 Fretin / FR | ||
02 /
DESSET, Simon 65 Rue Gantois Maison 2 F-59000 Lille / FR | |||
03 /
PAUL, Sébastien 58 Rue du Rieu F-59158 Thun Saint Amand / FR | |||
04 /
RAFFA, Guillaume Les Logis de la Rose Chemin de la Flachardière F-69610 Les Halles / FR | |||
05 /
ZHANG, Lei Résidence Léonard de Vinci - E 324 Boulevard Paul Langevin F-59650 Villeneuve D'ascq / FR | Representative(s) | McDade, Sophie V.G.A. Cabinet LLR 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 14806021.3 | 06.11.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014FR52839 | Priority number, date | FR20130060981 | 08.11.2013 Original published format: FR 1360981 | [2016/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015067899 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066069 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/40, C07F15/00, C07C69/24 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
C07C67/40 (EP,US);
B01J31/2414 (US);
B01J31/189 (EP);
B01J31/20 (EP);
B01J31/2282 (US);
B01J31/24 (EP,US);
B01J31/2409 (US);
C07F15/0046 (EP,US);
B01J2231/49 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/40, C07C69/14 (EP,US);
C07C67/40, C07C69/24 (US,EP);
C07C67/40, C07C69/26 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON ESTERN UND KATALYSATOR FÜR DIESE SYNTHESE | [2016/37] | English: | METHOD FOR SYNTHESISING ESTERS AND CATALYST FOR SAID SYNTHESIS | [2016/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE D'ESTERS ET CATALYSEUR DE LADITE SYNTHÈSE | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2012144650 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP], et al) [AD] 1-19* page 51; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2599544 (LEIBNIZ INST FUER KATALYSE E V AN DER UNI ROSTOCK [DE]) [A] 1-19 * page 4, paragraph 37; claims 1,13 *; | [I] - MARCELLO BERTOLI ET AL, "Osmium and Ruthenium Catalysts for Dehydrogenation of Alcohols", ORGANOMETALLICS, (20110711), vol. 30, no. 13, doi:10.1021/om200437n, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 3479 - 3482, XP055025189 [I] 1-19 * entrée 6 du tableau 2 , entrée c du schéma 3 et 6 composé mentionné à la page 3480 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om200437n | by applicant | WO2012144650 | EP2599544 | - M. NIELSEN; H. JUNGE; A. KAMMER; M.BELLER, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2012), vol. 51, pages 5711 - 5713 | - D. SPASYUK; D. GUSEV, ORGANOMETALLICS, (2012), vol. 31, pages 5239 - 5242 | - M. BERTOLI; A. CHOUALEB; A. J. LOUGH; B. MOORE; D. SPASYUK; D. GUSEV, ORGANOMETALLICS, (2011), vol. 30, pages 3479 - 3482 | - J. ZHANG; G. LEITUS; Y. BEN-DAVID; D. MILSTEIN, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 10840 - 10841 | - BERTOLI, M.; CHOUALEB, A.; LOUGH, A. J.; MOORE B.; SPASYUK, D.; GUSEV D. G., ORGANOMETALLICS, (2011), vol. 30, page 3479 |