EP3080374 - MECHANICAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE FOR A TURNING SASH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/42] | MECHANICAL ENERGY STORAGE APPARATUS FOR A ROTATING SASH | ||
[2017/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Straße 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTTER, Felix Kirchheimerstrasse 19 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2016/42] | Application number, filing date | 14806207.8 | 20.11.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014EP75116 | Priority number, date | DE20131020396 | 10.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013020396 | [2016/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015086282 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080374 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3080374 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E05F3/22, E05F1/10, E05F15/611 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
E05F1/105 (EP);
E05F15/611 (EP);
E05F3/222 (EP);
E05Y2201/214 (EP);
E05Y2201/246 (EP);
E05Y2201/418 (EP);
E05Y2201/462 (EP);
E05Y2201/62 (EP);
E05Y2800/252 (EP);
E05Y2900/531 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN DREHFLÜGEL | [2016/42] | English: | MECHANICAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE FOR A TURNING SASH | [2017/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉCANIQUE DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE POUR UN VANTAIL ROTATIF | [2017/24] |
Former [2016/42] | MECHANICAL ENERGY STORAGE APPARATUS FOR A ROTATING SASH | ||
Former [2016/42] | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE MÉCANIQUE POUR VANTAIL | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 02.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2014 | AL | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | MT | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | HR | 25.10.2017 | |
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 25.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2305936 (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] * * claims 1, 7, 8 * * figure - *; | [AD]EP0693609 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * claims 1, 2, 9 * | by applicant | EP0693609 |