EP3003207 - DENTAL APPLIANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frantz, Donald Frantz Design Inc. 25206 Sundown Canyon Katy, Texas 7794 / US | [2019/39] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Frantz, Donald Frantz Design Inc. 25206 Sundown Canyon Katy, Texas 7794 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANTZ, Joseph Frantz Design Inc. 3202 Oakmont Blvd. Austin, Texas 78703 / US | 02 /
KINCHEN, Dane A&D Plastics 1905 W. Thomas St. Suite D-208 Hammond, Louisiana 70401 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2016/15] | Romano, Giuseppe, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 14807523.7 | 03.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US40763 | Priority number, date | US201361830994P | 04.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361830994 P | US201361830755P | 04.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361830755 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014197516 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003207 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003207 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/56, B29C51/02, B29C51/10, A61C7/08 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
A61F5/566 (EP,US);
B29B11/08 (US);
B29C45/1676 (US);
B29C51/002 (US);
B29C51/02 (US);
B29C51/10 (US);
B29C51/14 (US);
A61C13/206 (EP,US);
A61C19/063 (EP,US);
A61C7/08 (EP,US);
A61C7/36 (EP,US);
B29K2021/003 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | A61C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DENTALVORRICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2016/15] | English: | DENTAL APPLIANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [2016/15] | French: | SYSTÈME D'APPAREIL DENTAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 19.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2014 | AL | 25.09.2019 | AT | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | CZ | 25.09.2019 | DK | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | ES | 25.09.2019 | FI | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | IT | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | NL | 25.09.2019 | PL | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SE | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | TR | 25.09.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | NO | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | IE | 03.06.2020 | LU | 03.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.06.2014 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IE | 03.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IE | 03.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
LU | 03.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
NO | 25.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2192359 (CLARKE R & CO LTD) [A] 1,11 * page 1, lines 88-12 *; | [I]DE102008061325 (DR. HINZ LABOR, FACHLABORATORIUM FUER KIEFERORTHOPAEDIE GMBH & CO. KG [DE]) [I] 1,5,11-13,16-21 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0024]; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2011039223 (LI CHUNHUA [US], et al) [X] 22,23 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] , [0062]; figures 2B,3; claim 1 * [I] 1-4,11; | [IA]DE102010036107 (SCHEU DENTAL GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-4,11,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0013] , [0 17] , [0019] * [A] 5; | [A]DE202013001392U (SCHEU DENTAL GMBH [DE]) [A] 5* paragraphs [0017] , [0020]; figure 1; claim 9 * | International search | [Y]US5597525 (KODA HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5829980 (SHERIDAN JOHN J [US], et al); | [A]US2002144691 (KITTELSEN JON D [US], et al); | [A]US6584978 (BRETT DANIEL J [US], et al); | [X]US2009155736 (VEKOERRER FRANZ [CH], et al); | [A]WO2009155223 (BITE TECH INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2012197002 (NELSON DAVID E [US]) | by applicant | DE102008061325 |