EP3004732 - LED PIXEL DEVICE WITH DYNAMIC DIFFUSER EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Professional Denmark ApS Olof Palmes Allé 18 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2018/33] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Martin Professional ApS Olof Palmes Allé, 18 8200 Århus N / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLETIER, Paul 356 Strathmore Dorval Québec, Québec H9S 2J4 / CA | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Bertsch, Florian Oliver Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14807824.9 | 02.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014DK50154 | Priority number, date | DK20130070310 | 07.06.2013 Original published format: DK 201370310 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014194915 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004732 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3004732 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F21V14/06, F21S10/00, G02B5/02, G09F9/33 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G09F9/33 (EP,US);
F21K9/60 (US);
F21V14/02 (US);
F21V14/08 (US);
G02B19/0066 (EP,US);
G02B5/0278 (EP,US);
G02B5/0294 (EP,US);
G02B7/005 (EP,US);
G09G3/32 (US);
G09G5/10 (US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
G09G2300/046 (US);
G09G2300/0469 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-PIXEL-VORRICHTUNG MIT DYNAMISCHEN DIFFUSOREFFEKTEN | [2016/15] | English: | LED PIXEL DEVICE WITH DYNAMIC DIFFUSER EFFECTS | [2016/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PIXEL DEL AVEC DES EFFETS DE DIFFUSEUR DYNAMIQUE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 03.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.08.2022 | AT | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005045793 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 4 *; | [A]US2005265029 (EPSTEIN KENNETH A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US7352339 (MORGAN FREDERICK MARSHALL [US], et al) [Y] 5,11,15 * figures 102, 104 * * column 40, lines 37-40 * * column 40, line 67 - column 41, line 3 *; | [XYI]US2010188018 (SALM MARKUS [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,12,13 * figure 4C * * paragraphs [0038] , [0062] , [0065] , [0082] * [Y] 5,11,15 [I] 3,9,10,14; | [A]US2012147059 (CHEN WU-LI [TW], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 7, 16 * | International search | [A]US6157424 (EICHENLAUB JESSE B [US]) [A] - * . See the entire document. *; | [A]US2007070062 (BOLL PETER [DE]) [A] - * . See the entire document. *; | [Y]US7352339 (MORGAN FREDERICK MARSHALL [US], et al) [Y] 5(page 17), 11, 15 * . See in particular col. 9, line 59 - col. 10, line 14; col. 39, line 37 - col. 41, line 25; and Figs. 1, 101-105, 108-109. *; | [A]US2008080179 (GIORGI GABRIELE [IT]) [A] - * . See the entire document. *; | [A]US2008106901 (CALMES JACK [US], et al) [A] - * . See the entire document. *; | [A]US2010027085 (CATALANO ANTHONY [US]) [A] - * . See in particular paragraphs 11-12, 24-34, 46-50; and Figs. 1-3, 9-10. *; | [XY]US2010188018 (SALM MARKUS [DE]) [X] X: 1-4, 5(page16), 6-10, 12-14 * . See in particular paragraphs 0024, 0052, 0062-0070, 0090-0091; and Figs. 2, 3A, 4C, 5. * [Y] Y: 5(page 17), 11, 15; | [A]US2011103074 (JURIK PAVEL [CZ]) [A] - * . See the entire document. *; | [A]US2012230039 (HANSEN ELLEVANG CLAUS [DK], et al) [A] - * . See the entire document. *; | [A]US2013039062 (VINTHER THOMAS [DK], et al) [A] -* . See the entire document. * |