EP3007444 - IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING APPARATUS, AND IMAGE DECODING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERADA, Kengo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2 Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NISHI, Takahiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2 Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SASAI, Hisao c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2 Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIKAWA, Satoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2 Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14807897.5 | 04.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP02974 | Priority number, date | US201361831209P | 05.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361831209 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014196198 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007444 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/30, H04N19/31, H04N19/187, H04N19/156, H04N19/132 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/30 (EP,US);
H04N19/146 (US);
H04N19/105 (US);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/154 (US);
H04N19/156 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | H04N19/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | BILDCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDDECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/15] | English: | IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING APPARATUS, AND IMAGE DECODING APPARATUS | [2016/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE, APPAREIL DE CODAGE D'IMAGE ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2015 | Translation filed | 11.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.06.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013004911 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | International search | [A]JP2000324486 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-16* , paragraphs [0002] to [0004]; fig. 10 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009540734 (LG Electronics Inc.) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0042] to [0048]; fig. 3 & WO 2008/030068 A1 & US 2009/0220010 A1 & EP 2060123 A1 & KR 10-2008-0093427 A & CN 101395925 A *; | [A]JP2011216986 (YAMAHA CORP) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0040] to [0043]; fig. 11 (Family: none) *; | [X] - BENJAMIN BROSS et al., "Editors' proposed corrections to HEVC version 1", Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC) of ITU-T SG 16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 JCTVC-M0432, ITU-T, (20130426), pages 32 - 33,63-66, XP030057924 [X] 8-14, 16 |