EP3006454 - NEW COMPOUNDS HAVING TRIPLE ACTIVITIES OF THROMBOLYSIS, ANTITHROMBOTIC AND RADICAL SCAVENGING, AND SYNTHESIS, NANO-STRUCTURE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Lumosa Therapeutics Co., Ltd. Room 3026, 3rd Floor, Building 1 No. 146, 1st East Fute Road Shanghai Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Shiqi Room 5, 9th Floor, Building 26 No. 38 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Ming Room 401, Building C Yulin Community Fengtai District Beijing 100069 / CN | 03 /
WU, Jianhui No.10 Xitoutiao You An Men Wai Fengtai District Beijing 100069 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Yuji No.10 Xitoutiao You An Men Wai Fengtai District Beijing 100069 / CN | 05 /
FENG, Qiqi No.10 Xitoutiao You An Men Wai Fengtai District Beijing 100069 / CN | [2021/02] |
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
PENG, Shiqi Room 5 9th Floor Building 26 No.38 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHAO, Ming Room 401 Building C Yulin Community Fengtai District Beijing 100069 / CN | |||
03 /
WU, Jianhui No.10 Xitoutiao You An Men Wai Fengtai District Beijing 100069 / CN | |||
04 /
WANG, Yuji No.10 Xitoutiao You An Men Wai Fengtai District Beijing 100069 / CN | |||
05 /
FENG, Qiqi No.10 Xitoutiao You An Men Wai Fengtai District Beijing 100069 / CN | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/02] |
Former [2016/15] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14807973.4 | 03.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014CN79098 | Priority number, date | CN201310225330 | 05.06.2013 Original published format: CN201310225330 | [2016/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014194809 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006454 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006454 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/117, A61K38/07, A61P7/02, A61P39/06, C07K5/02, A61K38/00, C07K5/097, C07K5/11, C07K5/078, A61K47/54, A61K47/55, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P9/14, C07D217/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
C07K5/0821 (EP,US);
A61K38/06 (RU);
A61K47/545 (EP,US);
A61K47/55 (EP,RU,US);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07D217/00 (EP,US);
C07D217/24 (RU);
C07K5/0215 (EP,RU,US);
C07K5/06165 (EP,US);
C07K5/1019 (EP,US);
C07K5/1024 (RU);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | C07K5/117, A61K38/07, A61P7/02, A61P39/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE VERBINDUNGEN MIT DREIFACHWIRKUNG VON THROMBOLYSE, ANTITHROMBOTISCHER UND RADIKALFÄNGERWIRKUNG SOWIE SYNTHESE, NANOSTRUKTUR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/15] | English: | NEW COMPOUNDS HAVING TRIPLE ACTIVITIES OF THROMBOLYSIS, ANTITHROMBOTIC AND RADICAL SCAVENGING, AND SYNTHESIS, NANO-STRUCTURE AND USE THEREOF | [2016/15] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS AYANT UNE TRIPLE ACTIVITÉ DE THROMBOLYSE, ANTITHROMBOTIQUE ET DE CAPTURE DES RADICAUX ET LEUR SYNTHÈSE, NANOSTRUCTURE ET UTILISATION | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2015 | Translation filed | 03.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 21.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CN101190941 (UNIV CAPITAL MEDICAL SCIENCES [CN]); | [AD]CN101497651B (UNIV CAPITAL MEDICAL); | International search | [Y]CN101190941 (UNIV CAPITAL MEDICAL SCIENCES [CN]); | [Y]CN102887941 (UNIVISION PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [PY]CN103450330 (UNIV CAPITAL MEDICAL SCIENCES) | by applicant | CN101190941 | CN101497651B |