EP3006721 - ELECTROMAGNETIC FUEL INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAOKU, Atsushi c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba, Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Tohru c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba, Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14808006.2 | 19.03.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP57434 | Priority number, date | JP20130119387 | 06.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013119387 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014196240 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006721 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M55/02, B23K26/28, B23K33/00, F02M61/16 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
F02M61/168 (EP,US);
F02M51/061 (US);
F02M2200/8084 (EP,US);
F02M2200/856 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | F02M51/06, F02M55/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL | [2016/15] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC FUEL INJECTION VALVE | [2016/15] | French: | VANNE ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2015 | Translation filed | 07.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 09.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002130206 (KOBAYASHI NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * figures 4, 12 * [I] 2,4-7,9-11; | [X]EP1335127 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 8 *; | [XI]JP2005069090 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3,8 * paragraph [0018]; figure 4 * [I] 2,4-7,9-11; | [X]JP2005292119 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [X] 1* figure 2 *; | [XI]EP1998039 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,8 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1,7 * [I] 2,4-7,9-11; | [A]US2011204276 (HUEMMER FERDINAND [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [XI]WO2011121839 (KEIHIN CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * figure 3 * [I] 2,4-7,9-11; | [A]US2011284666 (SUGIYAMA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0048]; figure 1 * | International search | [XA]JP2005069090 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-8, 10-11 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0021]; fig. 4, 5, 7, 8 (Family: none) * [A] 9; | [A]JP2008542601 (Robert Bosch GmbH) [A] 1 * , fig. 1 & US 2007/0246016 A1 & WO 2006/125686 A1 & DE 102005024053 A1 *; | [A]JP2011027009 (KEIHIN CORP) [A] 1-11* , paragraph [0036]; fig. 1 & US 2012/0153052 A1 & EP 2458195 A1 & WO 2011/010502 A1 & CN 102472215 A * | by applicant | JP2006200454 | JP2006233866 | JP2008303810 | JP2011220259 |