EP2875595 - CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION (CSI) FEEDBACK AND CODEBOOK SUBSAMPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/46] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states NEC Laboratories America, Inc. 4 Independence Way, Suite 200 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUE, Guosen 3812 Hunters Glen Drive Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 02 /
PRASAD, Narayan NEC Laboratories America, Inc. 4 Independence Way, Suite 200 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
RANGARAJAN, Sampath 40 Linberger Drive Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2016/19] |
Former [2015/22] | 01 /
YUE, Guosen 3812 Hunters Glen Drive Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | ||
02 /
PRASAD, Narayan 625-2 8470 Limekiln Pike Wyncote, Pennsylvania 19095 / US | |||
03 /
RANGARAJAN, Sampath 40 Linberger Drive Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14808175.5 | 05.06.2014 | WO2014US40977 | Priority number, date | US201361832635P | 07.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361832635 P | US201361864082P | 09.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361864082 P | US201414295414 | 04.06.2014 Original published format: US201414295414 | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014197643 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875595 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04J11/00, H04B7/06, H04B7/04, H04L5/00 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
H04B7/0478 (EP,CN,RU,US);
H04B7/0456 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B7/0417 (KR);
H04B7/0486 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0626 (RU,US);
H04B7/063 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0639 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0658 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/066 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0697 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/22] | H04B7/26, H04J11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | RÜCKKOPPLUNG VON KANALZUSTANDSINFORMATIONEN UND CODEBUCH-UNTERABTASTUNG | [2015/22] | English: | CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION (CSI) FEEDBACK AND CODEBOOK SUBSAMPLING | [2015/22] | French: | RENVOI D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL (CSI) ET SOUS-ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE DICTIONNAIRE DE CODES | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012076024 (KO HYUNSOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2012087425 (GOMADAM KRISHNA SRIKANTH [US], et al); | [A]US2012218948 (ONGGOSANUSI EKO N [US], et al); | [A]US2013077709 (ZHOU YONGXING [CN], et al); | [A]US2013088978 (MONDAL BISHWARUP [US], et al) |