EP3077372 - ROR GAMMA (RORY) MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lead Pharma Holding B.V. Kloosterstraat 9 RK 5349 AB Oss / NL | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/18] | For all designated states Lead Pharma Holding B.V. Transistorweg 5 6534 AT Nijmegen / NL | ||
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Lead Pharma Cel Models IP B.V. Molenweg 79 5349 AC Oss / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALS, Joseph Maria Gerardus Barbara Lead Pharma Cel Models IP B.V. Pivot Park Molenweg 79 5349 AC Oss / NL | 02 /
NABUURS, Sander Bernardus Lead Pharma Cel Models IP B.V. Pivot Park Molenweg 79 5349 AC Oss / NL | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 14809794.2 | 03.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014EP76390 | Priority number, date | EP20130195813 | 05.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13195813 | EP20140183274 | 02.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14183274 | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015082533 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3077372 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3077372 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3077372 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/16, C07C311/20, C07C317/44, C07C317/46, C07D213/75, A61P19/02, A61P25/28, A61P29/00, A61P37/00, A61K31/18, A61K31/10, A61K31/44, A61K31/167 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
C07C317/44 (EP,US);
C07C317/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C311/16 (EP,US);
C07C311/20 (EP,US);
C07C317/48 (KR);
C07D213/75 (EP,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/18, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROR-GAMMA-MODULATOREN | [2018/32] | English: | ROR GAMMA (RORY) MODULATORS | [2016/41] | French: | MODULATEURS ROR GAMMA | [2018/32] |
Former [2016/41] | ROR-GAMMA(RORY)-MODULATOREN | ||
Former [2016/41] | MODULATEURS DU ROR GAMMA (RORY) | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 22.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | LV | 06.02.2019 | |
IS | 06.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2011115892 (GRIFFIN PATRICK R [US], et al) [AD] 1-28* claims 1,2,13,29,30,41 *; | [AD]WO2013029338 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-28 * page 243, line 13 - page 244, line 18; examples 1-14,16,18-161,163-174,176-200; claim - * * examples ,202-230,232-238,240-257,264,266-270 * |