EP3078078 - SEGMENTED STRUCTURE, IN PARTICULAR, FOR A SATELLITE ANTENNA REFLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Safran Launchers SAS 60-62 rue Camille Desmoulins 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/13] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space SAS 51-61 Route de Verneuil 78130 Les Mureaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBORGNE, Florian 3 rue des Néréides F-78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
BRINDEAU, Aymeric 63 rue du Tir 92000 Nanterre / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | 01 /
LEBORGNE, Florian 20 bis rue Victor Hugo F-78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | ||
02 /
BRINDEAU, Aymeric 63 rue du Tir F-92000 Nanterre / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14809916.1 | 26.11.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014FR00254 | Priority number, date | FR20130002853 | 06.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1302853 | [2016/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015082778 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3078078 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/16, H01Q1/08, H01Q1/28 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
H01Q1/288 (EP,US);
H01Q1/08 (EP,US);
H01Q15/162 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | H01Q15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Title | German: | SEGMENTIERTE STRUKTUR, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN SATELLITENANTENNENREFLEKTOR | [2016/41] | English: | SEGMENTED STRUCTURE, IN PARTICULAR, FOR A SATELLITE ANTENNA REFLECTOR | [2016/41] | French: | STRUCTURE SEGMENTÉE, EN PARTICULIER POUR RÉFLECTEUR D'ANTENNE DE SATELLITE | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 17.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 12.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1043802 (HUGHES ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 9A-9D * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] *; | [A]US6505381 (THOMSON MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 7, 8 * * column 1, line 12 - line 14 * * column 1, line 49 - line 52 ** column 1, line 56 - line 59 * |