EP3007625 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING MEDICAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Woong 103-206 110 Maeyeong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-802 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jae-chool 235-602 16 Bongyeong-ro 1744beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-744 / KR | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Lubberdink, Pim, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 14810295.7 | 11.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014KR05128 | Priority number, date | KR20130067303 | 12.06.2013 Original published format: KR 20130067303 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014200265 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007625 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, G06F19/00 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B6/00 (KR);
A61B6/10 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2016/16] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG MEDIZINISCHER INFORMATIONEN | [2016/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING MEDICAL INFORMATION | [2016/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PRÉSENTER DES INFORMATIONS MÉDICALES | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 30.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 23.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2422702 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044] * [Y] 6,9,10 [I] 13; | [YA]US2010053213 (ISHIDA HIRONOBU [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0156] * [A] 1-5,9-15; | [Y]KR20040075312 (UNIV INFORMATION & COMM) [Y] 9,10 * page 3, line 11 - line 16 *; | [XPA]EP2468189 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [XP] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1,2; claims 1,5,6 * [A] 2-13; | [A]US2006052684 (TAKAHASHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0055] * | International search | [Y]JP2004180834 (GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY CO LLC); | [Y]JP2012135619 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER (ISRAEL) LTD); | [Y]JP2010057528 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [Y]KR20040077609 (RESEARCH AND INDUSTRIAL COOPERATION GROUP) |