EP3040068 - ADHESIVE SHEET FOR APPLICATION TO THE SKIN, AND PERCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION PREPARATION USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KM Transderm Ltd. 3-18 Nakanoshima 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGINO, Hiroyuki c/o KM Transderm Ltd. 1055 Matsubara Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2702 / JP | 02 /
YUKIMOTO, Sadao c/o KM Transderm Ltd. 1055 Matsubara Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2702 / JP | 03 /
HAMADA, Atsuyo c/o KM Transderm Ltd. 1055 Matsubara Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2702 / JP | 04 /
AKAZAWA, Mitsuji c/o KM Transderm Ltd. 1055 Matsubara Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2702 / JP | 05 /
GOTO, Masaoki c/o KM Transderm Ltd. 1055 Matsubara Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2702 / JP | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 14810664.4 | 12.06.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014JP65637 | Priority number, date | WO2013JP66273 | 12.06.2013 Original published format: PCT/JP2013/066273 | JP20130273767 | 11.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013273767 | [2016/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014200072 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040068 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3040068 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/44, A61K9/70, A61K31/27 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/7007 (EP,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61K31/325 (US);
A61K31/381 (US);
A61K31/4168 (US);
A61K9/70 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | A61K9/70, A61K47/32, A61K47/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBEFOLIE ZUR ANWENDUNG AUF DER HAUT UND PERKUTANES ABSORPTIONSPRÄPARAT DAMIT | [2016/27] | English: | ADHESIVE SHEET FOR APPLICATION TO THE SKIN, AND PERCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION PREPARATION USING SAME | [2016/27] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE À APPLIQUER SUR LA PEAU, ET PRÉPARATION D'ABSORPTION PERCUTANÉE L'UTILISANT | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2016 | Translation filed | 13.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2016/27] | 13.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 11.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 13.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 13.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 13.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 13.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2016 | Decision despatched | 13.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 13.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2014 | AL | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | IT | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.06.2014 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 12.06.2014 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.06.2014 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | FI | 18.08.2021 | |
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 18.08.2021 | |
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1864655 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7,12 * page 2, paragraphs 7, 9-10 * * page 5, paragraphs 40-41, 43 * * page 11; claims 1,3,10 *[Y] 10,11; | [XY] - CHENGXIAO WANG ET AL, "Evaluation of Drug Release Profile from Patches Based on Styrene-Isoprene-Styrene Block Copolymer: The Effect of Block Structure and Plasticizer", AAPS PHARMSCITECH, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, US, (20120403), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1208/S12249-012-9778-3, ISSN 1530-9932, pages 556 - 567, XP035064305 [X] 1-9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/s12249-012-9778-3 | [XY] - CHENGXIAO WANG ET AL, "A Drug-in-Adhesive Matrix Based on Thermoplastic Elastomer: Evaluation of Percutaneous Absorption, Adhesion, and Skin Irritation", AAPS PHARMSCITECH, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, US, (20120908), vol. 13, no. 4, doi:10.1208/S12249-012-9849-5, ISSN 1530-9932, pages 1179 - 1189, XP035148009 [X] 1-9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/s12249-012-9849-5 | International search | [X]US2006211808 (FREI PIA [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2012029325 (KM TRANSDERM [JP], et al); | [X]JP2012149061 (NICHIBAN KK); | [X]WO2013020556 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al); | [X]WO2013081014 (KM TRANSDERM LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPH09291028 | JPH10316559 | JP2001302502 | WO2006093139 | WO2007064407 | WO2012029325 | - Japanese Pharmaceutical Excipients 2003, YAKUJI NIPPO, page 375 | - J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1944), vol. 82, pages 377 - 390 |